EP 1621837 A3 20060726 - Bottom drawer type refrigerator having basket lift device
Title (en)
Bottom drawer type refrigerator having basket lift device
Title (de)
Bodenschubladekühlschrank mit Korbfördervorrichtung
Title (fr)
Réfrigérateur du type tiroir de base avec dispositif de levage d'un panier
Publication
Application
Priority
KR 20040059930 A 20040729
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP1621837A2] In a refrigerator which includes a main body (10) having a lower cooling chamber (18) disposed at a lower portion of the main body, a base frame (30) is disposed to be moved in inward/outward directions at a lower cooling chamber (18) and has a drawer door (22) at a front side thereof. A lift frame (36) is disposed above the base frame (30), on which a basket (20) is placed. A rotatable lead screw (40) is vertically disposed at a rear surface of the drawer door (22), and a lift unit is formed at front of the lift frame (36) for moving up and down along the lead screw (40). A driving unit (38) rotates the lead screw (40) clockwise or counterclockwise. When the basket (20) is drawn out, the basket can be lifted to allow the user to take a food item out of the basket without bending his/her back. Thus, users' convenience can be enhanced.
IPC 8 full level
F25D 25/02 (2006.01); A47B 88/00 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP KR US)
F25D 23/02 (2013.01 - KR); F25D 25/00 (2013.01 - KR); F25D 25/02 (2013.01 - KR); F25D 25/025 (2013.01 - EP US); A47B 2210/17 (2013.01 - EP US); F25D 25/04 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [A] US 3033636 A 19620508 - WURTZ CLIFFORD H, et al
- [A] FR 2315888 A1 19770128 - AUBER IVAN [FR]
- [A] DE 29701227 U1 19970430 - TIAW THUERINGER INST FUER AKAD [DE]
- [A] US 2855262 A 19581007 - SHARPE VERLOS G
- [A] US 911843 A 19090209 - SAMPLE AARON C [US]
- [A] US 2841459 A 19580701 - SHARPE VERLOS G
- [PA] US 2005073225 A1 20050407 - KWON YONG-CHOI [KR], et al
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2002, no. 02 2 April 2002 (2002-04-02)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 21 3 August 2001 (2001-08-03)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2002, no. 04 4 August 2002 (2002-08-04)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1621837 A2 20060201; EP 1621837 A3 20060726; EP 1621837 B1 20080326; AU 2005201538 A1 20060216; AU 2005201538 B2 20061109; CN 100344927 C 20071024; CN 1727825 A 20060201; DE 602005005571 D1 20080508; DE 602005005571 T2 20080703; KR 100652583 B1 20061206; KR 20060011224 A 20060203; US 2006021373 A1 20060202
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 05008329 A 20050416; AU 2005201538 A 20050412; CN 200510078128 A 20050613; DE 602005005571 T 20050416; KR 20040059930 A 20040729; US 10453905 A 20050413