EP 1622106 A1 20060201 - Hazard warning device, especially for a fire or intrusion signalling system
Title (en)
Hazard warning device, especially for a fire or intrusion signalling system
Title (de)
Gefahrenmelder insbesondere Brand- oder Einbruchmelder
Title (fr)
Avertisseur de risques, en particulier pour un système de signalisation d'incendie ou d'effraction
Publication
Application
Priority
DE 102004036743 A 20040729
Abstract (en)
A fire or break in alarm has a series circuit with semiconductor switch (T1), inductance (L1) and high power LED (D1) (Light Emitting Diode)with diode (D4) parallel to the inductance applying the alarm supply voltage to the series circuit terminals, and a signal processor that generates a control signal in the alarm state that causes the switch in the ON state to pass and block a series of short pulses.
IPC 8 full level
G08B 5/36 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
G08B 5/38 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [X] US 2004041702 A1 20040304 - TOULMIN JOHN W [CA], et al
- [YA] US 5019805 A 19910528 - CURL RICKY L [US], et al
- [YA] US 2003209994 A1 20031113 - KERENYI LADISLAS [US]
- [YA] US 5493272 A 19960220 - BEGHELLI GIAN P [IT]
- [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2002, no. 10 10 October 2002 (2002-10-10)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2003, no. 09 3 September 2003 (2003-09-03)
- [A] PROF. DR.-ING. MARTIN OSSMANN: "Kleine DC/DC-Konverter", ELEKTOR, November 2002 (2002-11-01), Internet, pages 64 - 68, XP002353884, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://www.elektor.de/Default.aspx?tabid=27&year=2002&month=-1&art=70213&PN=On> [retrieved on 20051110]
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1622106 A1 20060201; EP 1622106 B1 20080514; AT E395675 T1 20080515; DE 102004036743 A1 20060323; DE 102004036743 B4 20070802; DE 502005004087 D1 20080626; ES 2305957 T3 20081101; PL 1622106 T3 20080930
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 05015932 A 20050721; AT 05015932 T 20050721; DE 102004036743 A 20040729; DE 502005004087 T 20050721; ES 05015932 T 20050721; PL 05015932 T 20050721