Global Patent Index - EP 1623074 B1

EP 1623074 B1 2007-10-10 - CONTROL DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MONITORING A WORK TRAIN

Title (en)

CONTROL DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MONITORING A WORK TRAIN

Title (de)

KONTROLLVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG EINES ARBEITSZUGES

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR CONTROLER UN TRAIN DE TRAVAUX

Publication

EP 1623074 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 04702711 A

Priority

  • EP 2004050021 W
  • AT 7202003 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6925366B2] A control system for monitoring a work train for performing track maintenance operations has a computer connected to receive information from a multitude of work vehicles constituting the work train. A respective vehicle identifying device is associated with each work vehicle, the vehicle identifying device being connected communicate with the computer (e.g., via a control line) and configured for storing vehicle characteristics defining the respective work vehicle. The computer connected to the control line includes a display for visually indicating, in the case of a malfunction report concerning a particular work vehicle, the respective vehicle characteristics in connection with the position of the respective vehicle within the work train.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 1/00 (2006.01); E01B 27/06 (2006.01); E01B 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 27/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

US 2004230355 A1 20041118; US 6925366 B2 20050802; AT 375416 T 20071015; AU 2004236426 A1 20041118; AU 2004236426 B2 20090305; CN 100355981 C 20071219; CN 1701152 A 20051123; DE 502004005208 D1 20071122; DK 1623074 T3 20071227; EP 1623074 A1 20060208; EP 1623074 B1 20071010; JP 2006525906 A 20061116; JP 4718447 B2 20110706; RU 2005103823 A 20050910; RU 2318684 C2 20080310; WO 2004099503 A1 20041118

INPADOC legal status


2015-06-16 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2015-03-31 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2015-02-15 [REG AT MA03] REVOCATION OF THE PATENT

- Document: AT 375416 T

- Effective date: 20140717

2015-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20071010

2015-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20071010

2015-01-08 [REG DE R107] PUBLICATION OF GRANT OF EUROPEAN PATENT RESCINDED

- Document: DE 502004005208

- Effective date: 20150108

2014-11-12 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20140717

2014-11-12 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20140717

2014-11-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PLASSER & THEURER, EXPORT VON BAHNBAUMASCHINEN, AT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FRANZ PLASSER BAHNBAUMASCHINEN-INDUSTRIEGESELLSCHAFT M.B.H., WIEN, AT

- Document: DE 502004005208

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-11-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502004005208

- Representative's name: RAU, SCHNECK & HUEBNER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSAN, DE

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-10-31 [REG CH PLX] PATENT DECLARED INVALID FROM DATE OF GRANT ONWARDS

2014-10-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502004005208

- Representative's name: RAU, SCHNECK & HUEBNER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSAN, DE

2014-07-17 [REG DE R064] EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 502004005208

2014-07-17 [REG DE R103] PATENT REVOKED BY EPO

- Document: DE 502004005208

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140129

- Year of fee payment: 11

2014-05-30 [PGFP HU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Payment date: 20140113

- Year of fee payment: 11

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140122

- Year of fee payment: 11

2014-05-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20131205

- Year of fee payment: 11

2014-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20140122

- Year of fee payment: 11

2014-04-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20140115

- Year of fee payment: 11

2014-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140122

- Year of fee payment: 11

2014-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20140122

- Year of fee payment: 11

2014-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140122

- Year of fee payment: 11

2014-04-30 [PGFP RO] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Payment date: 20140113

- Year of fee payment: 11

2014-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140122

- Year of fee payment: 11

2014-04-30 [PGFP CZ] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Payment date: 20140108

- Year of fee payment: 11

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140321

- Year of fee payment: 11

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131218

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-08-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071010

2010-07-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080116

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071010

2009-06-30 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071010

2009-01-30 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071010

2009-01-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080111

2008-11-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: DEUTSCHE BAHN AG PATENTABTEILUNG

2008-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071010

2008-08-29 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-08-29 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071010

2008-08-20 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: DEUTSCHE BAHN AG PATENTABTEILUNG

- Effective date: 20080709

2008-06-11 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2008-05-30 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080110

2008-05-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080310

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080121

2008-04-28 [REG HU AG4A] FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS

- Document: HU E002664

2008-04-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-01-15 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-12-27 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2007-11-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502004005208 P 20071122

2007-11-20 [REG RO EPE] EP PATENT VALID IN ROMANIA

2007-11-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2007-10-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20071010

2007-10-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-03-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: THEURER,, JOSEF

2007-03-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LICHTBERGER, BERNHARD

2006-12-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: THEURER,, JOSEF

2006-12-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LICHTBERGER, BERNHARD

2006-08-16 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2006-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060301

2006-02-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR