Global Patent Index - EP 1623484 B1

EP 1623484 B1 2007-10-03 - MULTIPOINT PLUG FOR ELECTRICALLY CONNECTING METAL STRIP CONDUCTORS ARRANGED ON BOTH SIDES OF A CIRCUIT BOARD

Title (en)

MULTIPOINT PLUG FOR ELECTRICALLY CONNECTING METAL STRIP CONDUCTORS ARRANGED ON BOTH SIDES OF A CIRCUIT BOARD

Title (de)

KONTAKTLEISTE ZUR ELEKTRISCHEN KONTAKTIERUNG VON BEIDSEITIG AUF EINER LEITERPLATTE VERLAUFENDEN METALLISCHEN LEITERBAHNEN

Title (fr)

REGLETTE DE CONTACTS POUR LA MISE EN CONTACT ELECTRIQUE DE PISTES CONDUCTRICES METALLIQUES PLACEES SUR LES DEUX FACES D'UNE PLAQUETTE

Publication

EP 1623484 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 04726435 A

Priority

  • DE 2004000796 W
  • DE 10322172 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2004105192A1] The invention relates to a multipoint plug (1) for electrically connecting metallic strip conductors (21, 22) arranged on both sides of a circuit board (11) comprising a base body (2) provided with mutually opposite flexible contacts (3, 3a, 3b, 3c) which are longitudinally arranged in such a way that the front face of the circuit board (11) is insertable between said contacts (3, 3a, 3b, 3c), thereby producing electric contact thereof with the strip conductors (21, 22). The opposite contacts (3, 3a, 3b, 3c) are electrically insulated with respect to each other inside the base body (2). The aim of the invention is to develop a small-sized multipoint plug which exhibits as high electric strength as possible. For this purpose, a recess (24) is shaped between opposite contacts (3, 3a, 3b, 3c) in a longitudinal direction of the base body. When the circuit board (11) is inserted, said recess encompasses the frontal face thereof in such a way that an extended creepage distance is formed between opposite contacts (for instance, 3a, 3b).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/18 (2006.01); H01R 13/11 (2006.01); H01R 13/703 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/721 (2013.01); H01R 12/515 (2013.01); H01R 13/7034 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 2004105192 A1 20041202; CN 100477390 C 20090408; CN 1781217 A 20060531; DE 10322172 A1 20041223; DE 10322172 B4 20060614; DE 502004005141 D1 20071115; EP 1623484 A1 20060208; EP 1623484 B1 20071003; HK 1089565 A1 20090731

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160408

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160502

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160408

2017-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161230

2016-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160408

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151103

2015-11-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 502004005141

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150415

- Year of fee payment: 12

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150428

- Year of fee payment: 12

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150414

- Year of fee payment: 12

2015-04-15 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140620

- Year of fee payment: 11

2013-03-21 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 502004005141

- Effective date: 20130110

2008-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080704

2008-02-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-11-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20071102

2007-11-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502004005141 P 20071115

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-10-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-08-23 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2006-08-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-02-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20051020

2006-02-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT