Global Patent Index - EP 1626611 A3

EP 1626611 A3 2009-02-18 - Hearing aid with continuous control

Title (en)

Hearing aid with continuous control

Title (de)

Hörhilfegerät mit Endlos-Steller

Title (fr)

Prothèse auditive avec réglage continu

Publication

EP 1626611 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 05107176 A

Priority

DE 102004038669 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1626611A2] An output converter (14) outputs an acoustic information signal perceivable by the user of hearing aid (1) and comprising several information signals stored in or generated by the hearing aid. The information signals include an acoustic limit signal for indicating the user that the upper/lower end of a parameter regulating the volume is reached as a result of the user's activating the volume regulator (4). An independent claim is also included for a hearing aid system.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/558 (2013.01); H04R 25/00 (2013.01); H04R 25/554 (2013.01); H04R 2225/41 (2013.01); H04R 2225/61 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1626611 A2 20060215; EP 1626611 A3 20090218; US 2006029244 A1 20060209; US 7634097 B2 20091215

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-17 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20100703

2009-10-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090923

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB LI

2009-09-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090810

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU

2006-02-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-02-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU