Global Patent Index - EP 1627827 B1

EP 1627827 B1 2009-02-18 - Package for transporting and storing horn-shaped bakery goods

Title (en)

Package for transporting and storing horn-shaped bakery goods

Title (de)

Verpackung zum Transport und zur Lagerung von hörnchenförmigen Gebäckteilen

Title (fr)

Emballage pour le transport et le stockage des produits de pâtisserie en forme de cornet

Publication

EP 1627827 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 05017843 A

Priority

DE 202004013050 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1627827A2] The packaging comprises a lower part (3) and lid (4) which can be detachably connected together through complementary edge regions (5,6). The lower part has a support face for each pastry (2) designed so that with proper use the pastry is inclined so that its point (9) is lower than the axially opposite top side (10). At least a part of the support face is formed by a trough-shaped area (7) adapted to the shape of the pastry.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 85/36 (2006.01); B65D 81/02 (2006.01); B65D 85/60 (2006.01); B65D 85/78 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 85/78 (2013.01); B65D 81/025 (2013.01); B65D 85/36 (2013.01); B65D 85/60 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 202004013050 U1 20041216; DE 502005006636 D1 20090402; EP 1627827 A2 20060222; EP 1627827 A3 20070228; EP 1627827 B1 20090218

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170316

- Year of fee payment: 13

2016-02-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502005006636

- Representative's name: STRAUSS, PETER, DIPL.-PHYS. UNIV. MA, DE

2015-04-13 [REG DE R409] INTERNAL RECTIFICATION OF THE LEGAL STATUS COMPLETED

- Document: DE 502005006636

2015-04-08 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 502005006636

2015-04-08 [REG DE R409] INTERNAL RECTIFICATION OF THE LEGAL STATUS COMPLETED

- Document: DE 502005006636

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120817

2013-04-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120817

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-05-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120430

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110726

- Year of fee payment: 7

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100914

- Year of fee payment: 6

2010-01-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091119

2009-04-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502005006636 P 20090402

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-02-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-10-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-10-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070904

2007-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070731

2007-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU

2006-02-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-02-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU