Global Patent Index - EP 1628015 B8

EP 1628015 B8 2007-10-03 - Sealing arrangement of a piezo actuator of a fuel injector

Title (en)

Sealing arrangement of a piezo actuator of a fuel injector

Title (de)

Abdichtungsanordnung eines Piezoaktors eines Kraftstoffinjektors

Title (fr)

Système d'étanchéité pour actionneur piezoélectrique d'injecteur de carburant

Publication

EP 1628015 B8 (DE)

Application

EP 04104652 A

Priority

DE 102004040491 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1628015A1] The sealing device (10) has a head device (14), on which a sealing unit is mounted by means of projecting connecting pins (12). The sealing unit (18) is mounted on the head device. This unit has apertures through which the connecting pins can pass, and has a carrier (22) to which a sealing material (26) is applied closely round the connecting pins and the circumference of the head unit. Part (20) of it is made of micro-porous material.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 51/00 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01); H01L 41/053 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16J 15/10 (2013.01); F02M 51/005 (2013.01); F02M 51/0603 (2013.01); F02M 55/007 (2013.01); F02M 61/168 (2013.01); H01L 41/053 (2013.01); F02M 63/0026 (2013.01); F02M 63/0057 (2013.01); F02M 2200/16 (2013.01); F02M 2200/707 (2013.01); F02M 2200/90 (2013.01); F02M 2200/9015 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1628015 A1 20060222; EP 1628015 B1 20070815; EP 1628015 B8 20071003; DE 502004004656 D1 20070927; US 2006037579 A1 20060223; US 7339307 B2 20080304

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 13

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160930

- Year of fee payment: 13

2016-09-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070930

2008-07-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080516

2008-07-16 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070815

2008-03-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VDO AUTOMOTIVE AG

2008-03-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20070815

2008-03-07 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-12-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-09-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502004004656 P 20070927

2007-09-12 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SIEMENS VDO AUTOMOTIVE AG

2007-08-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-08-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-10-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060322

2006-02-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-02-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK