EP 1628088 A3 20060830 - Refrigerant cycle apparatus
Title (en)
Refrigerant cycle apparatus
Title (de)
Kältekreislaufgerät
Title (fr)
Appareil à cycle frigorifique
Publication
Application
Priority
JP 2004235405 A 20040812
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP1628088A2] In a refrigerant cycle apparatus which is operated at a supercritical pressure on a high-pressure side, for a purpose of maintaining or enhancing performances or reducing generation of clogging or a dimension of a capillary tube, a compressor has a first compression element, and a second compression element which compresses a refrigerant compressed by the first compression element, a gas phase refrigerant in an intermediate pressure receiver is sucked into the second compression element of the compressor, a liquid phase refrigerant in the intermediate pressure receiver is pressure reduced in a second pressure reducing device, and introduced into an evaporator, and the first pressure reducing device comprises a capillary tube on an upstream side of the refrigerant, and throttling means on a downstream side of the capillary tube.
IPC 8 full level
F25B 1/10 (2006.01); F25B 9/00 (2006.01); F25B 41/06 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
F25B 1/10 (2013.01 - EP US); F25B 9/008 (2013.01 - EP); F25B 41/39 (2021.01 - EP US); F25B 5/02 (2013.01 - EP); F25B 2309/061 (2013.01 - EP); F25B 2400/13 (2013.01 - EP); F25B 2400/23 (2013.01 - EP); F25B 2600/2507 (2013.01 - EP)
Citation (search report)
- [Y] US 3493012 A 19700203 - BASTIEN GILBERT J
- [X] EP 0424003 A2 19910424 - GEN ELECTRIC [US]
- [A] EP 1207359 A2 20020522 - CARRIER CORP [US]
- [A] US 4742694 A 19880510 - YAMANAKA YASUSHI [JP], et al
- [XY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2003, no. 07 3 July 2003 (2003-07-03)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2003, no. 04 2 April 2003 (2003-04-02)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2003, no. 12 5 December 2003 (2003-12-05)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1628088 A2 20060222; EP 1628088 A3 20060830; CN 1734209 A 20060215; JP 2006052898 A 20060223; JP 4049769 B2 20080220
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 05017389 A 20050810; CN 200510078568 A 20050617; JP 2004235405 A 20040812