Global Patent Index - EP 1630372 B1

EP 1630372 B1 2007-10-10 - Shell main body for muffler

Title (en)

Shell main body for muffler

Title (de)

Hohlkörper für Schalldämpfer

Title (fr)

Corps de silencieux

Publication

EP 1630372 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 05291634 A

Priority

JP 2004245772 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1630372A1] The shell main body (3) for a muffler includes an inner shell (1) in a cylindrical shape with a cross-section of an imperfect circle defined by small arc portions (4, 5) alternating with large arc portions (6, 7); and an outer shell (2) wrapping the inner shell (1) and formed in a cylindrical shape similar to the inner shell (1). An end portion (1a) of the inner shell (1) and an end portion (2a) of the outer shell (2) are overlapped in a circumstantial direction of the shell main body (3) to form a shell overlap portion (8) that is capable of discharging vapor in a gap (6a, 7a) of the large arc portions (6, 7) formed between the inner shell (1) and the outer shell (2) into one of an outside and an inside of the shell main body (3). This shell overlapping portion (8) is located in one of the small arc portions (4, 5).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 13/18 (2010.01); F01N 13/08 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 13/1872 (2013.01); F01N 13/08 (2013.01); F01N 2470/10 (2013.01); F01N 2470/24 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1630372 A1 20060301; EP 1630372 B1 20071010; DE 602005002800 D1 20071122; DE 602005002800 T2 20080828; ES 2294657 T3 20080401

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-14 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160712

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160712

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-07-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080711

2008-07-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2294657 T3

2007-11-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602005002800 P 20071122

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2007-10-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2006-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU