Global Patent Index - EP 1630418 B1

EP 1630418 B1 2007-10-17 - Control valve for variable displacement compressor

Title (en)

Control valve for variable displacement compressor

Title (de)

Kontrollventil für einen verstellbaren Taumelscheibenkompressor

Title (fr)

Soupape de contrôle pour un compresseur à capacité variable

Publication

EP 1630418 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 05016774 A

Priority

  • JP 2004239162 A
  • JP 2004289520 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1630418A1] A valve section 13 for controlling the flow rate of refrigerant flowing through a control valve 11 for a variable displacement compressor from a discharge chamber into a crankcase co-acts with a pressure-sensing section 12 provided at the side of a high-pressure port 18 that receives discharge pressure Pd. The pressure-sensing section 12 comprises a pressure-sensing piston 19 having a larger pressure-receiving area than a valve element 25. The pressure sensing piston 19 responds to a change of the discharge pressure Pd as caused by a rapid change of the rotational speed of an engine. Then a differential pressure is produced between the discharge pressure Pd and the pressure in a pressure-adjusting chamber 23, which temporarily produces a force for axially moving the pressure sensing piston 19. This force is transmitted via a shaft 24 to the valve element 25 to accelerate the opening and/or closing motion of the valve element 25 which motion is initiated by the differential pressure between the discharge pressure Pd and the suction pressure Ps. This action more promptly restores the compressor to a predetermined discharge capacity operation.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 27/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 27/1804 (2013.01); F04B 2027/1813 (2013.01); F04B 2027/1827 (2013.01); F04B 2027/185 (2013.01); F04B 2027/1854 (2013.01); F04B 2027/1859 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1630418 A1 20060301; EP 1630418 B1 20071017; DE 602005002899 D1 20071129; DE 602005002899 T2 20080221; JP 2006083837 A 20060330; KR 20060050535 A 20060519; US 2006039799 A1 20060223

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100302

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-05-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100430

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080926

- Year of fee payment: 4

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080822

- Year of fee payment: 4

2008-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080718

2008-07-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-11-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602005002899 P 20071129

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2006-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2006-09-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TGK CO., LTD.

2006-09-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HIROTA, HISATOSHI

2006-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060707

2006-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU