Global Patent Index - EP 1630485 A3

EP 1630485 A3 2007-10-17 - Table with a room air treating device, in particular trader's stall, and method for cooling a room with table and for cooling devices on the table

Title (en)

Table with a room air treating device, in particular trader's stall, and method for cooling a room with table and for cooling devices on the table

Title (de)

Mit raumlufttechnischer Einrichtung versehener Tisch, insbesondere Händlertisch, sowie Verfahren zur Kühlung eines mit einem Tisch ausgestatteten Raumes und zur Kühlung von dem Tisch zugeordneten Geräten

Title (fr)

Table comportant un appareil de traitement de l'air d'une pièce, en particulier table pour négociant, et méthode pour refroidir une pièce avec une table et pour refroidir des appareils sur cette table

Publication

EP 1630485 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 05016049 A

Priority

DE 102004042890 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1630485A2] The office table (2) with a table top and an air-technical device has at least one heat exchanger (20) through which flows air for especially cooling. The thermally treated air is divided into at least two partial flows of which a first (42) is blown out above the table top (4,5), and a second (38,39) is blown out below it. The air is delivered from at least one air feed device in the form of an electrically operated fan (21) which is installed downstream of the heat exchanger. An independent claim is included for a method for the cooling of a space and for the cooling of equipment.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/06 (2006.01); F24F 1/00 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 1/0007 (2013.01); F24F 13/0604 (2013.01); A47B 2200/06 (2013.01); F24F 2001/004 (2013.01); F24F 2221/10 (2013.01); F24F 2221/38 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1630485 A2 20060301; EP 1630485 A3 20071017; DE 102004042890 A1 20060309

INPADOC legal status


2012-08-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20120312

2008-06-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE GB LI LU

2008-05-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080417

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU

2006-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU