Global Patent Index - EP 1632143 B1

EP 1632143 B1 2007-10-31 - Fixture and button

Title (en)

Fixture and button

Title (de)

Befestigung und Knopf

Title (fr)

Fixation et bouton

Publication

EP 1632143 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 05255389 A

Priority

JP 2004257427 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1632143A2] A fixture (5A) for fixing a button body (4A) on a fabric (1) includes a flange (51), a fixing post (52) provided at the center of the flange, and a packing (53) provided on the flange. The packing (53) includes a spacer (58) provided on a surface of the flange confronting the fabric, and a retainer edge (60) extending from the spacer (58) to a surface opposite to the fixing post (52) via a connecting portion (59) and covering at least a part of an outer circumferential edge of the flange (51) except an area occupied by a pressure receiver (54).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44B 17/0088 (2013.01); A44B 17/0005 (2013.01); Y10T 24/3651 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1632143 A2 20060308; EP 1632143 A3 20070117; EP 1632143 B1 20071031; BR PI0504011 A 20060418; CN 100450390 C 20090114; CN 1759781 A 20060419; DE 602005003077 D1 20071213; DE 602005003077 T2 20080814; HK 1084307 A1 20090731; JP 2006068388 A 20060316; JP 4221344 B2 20090212; KR 100647399 B1 20061123; KR 20060050968 A 20060519; TW 200618750 A 20060616; TW I260973 B 20060901; US 2006048345 A1 20060309

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160831

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-01-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100902

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100902

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-06-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100902

2011-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100902

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091012

- Year of fee payment: 5

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090912

- Year of fee payment: 5

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090902

- Year of fee payment: 5

2009-11-30 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20090807

- Year of fee payment: 5

2008-10-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080801

2008-01-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-12-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602005003077 P 20071213

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT TR

2007-10-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT TR

2007-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU

2006-03-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050912

2006-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU