Global Patent Index - EP 1634033 B1

EP 1634033 B1 2009-02-11 - DEVICE FOR CONTROL OF FRAGMENT DISCHARGE FROM MAIN CHARGE LINERS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR CONTROL OF FRAGMENT DISCHARGE FROM MAIN CHARGE LINERS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG DER FRAGMENTABGABE VON HAUPTLADUNGSEINLAGEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE CONTROLE DE DECHARGE DE FRAGMENTS DU REVETEMENT D'UNE CHARGE PRINCIPALE

Publication

EP 1634033 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 04736473 A

Priority

  • SE 2004000897 W
  • SE 0301691 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2004109218A1] The material or fragment discharge is controlled by means of a device (4) in connection to the triggering, preferably by means if an initiation charge (5), of the main charge (3) in the ammunition unit (1). The liner is devised as being exposable for effect from the explosive charge or charges (6) that are devised as being able to be initiate able upon or shortly prior to the triggering of the main charge. The explosive charge achieves, upon initiation a pre-deformation of the liner (4) prior to the liner being affected by the triggering of the main charge for said material or fragment discharge The fragment forms can be rendered more effective in relation to design solution known by prior art by means of the choice explosive charge form and placement, different fragment forms can obtain among different ammunition units.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 1/02 (2006.01); F42B 12/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 1/02 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

FR 2086529 A5 19711231 - CLAUSIN PIERRE

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 2004109218 A1 20041216; DE 602004019411 D1 20090326; EP 1634033 A1 20060315; EP 1634033 B1 20090211; IL 172413 A 20120329; IL 172413 D0 20060410; SE 0301691 A 20041212; SE 0301691 D0 20030611; SE 525391 C2 20050215; US 2006180045 A1 20060817; US 7658150 B2 20100209; ZA 200509655 B 20070328

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120702

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120609

2013-04-18 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 602004019411

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-03-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120609

2013-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120609

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110629

- Year of fee payment: 8

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110623

- Year of fee payment: 8

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110628

- Year of fee payment: 8

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110629

- Year of fee payment: 8

2010-01-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091112

2009-03-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602004019411 P 20090326

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2009-02-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2009-01-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAE SYSTEMS BOFORS AB

2007-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070917

2007-02-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ROENN, TORSTEN

2007-02-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: THUMAN, CHRISTER

2007-02-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FREIJ, PETER

2006-09-20 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2006-09-20 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20051214

2006-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT