Global Patent Index - EP 1634842 A3

EP 1634842 A3 2009-02-18 - Wedge clamp for belt driven elevator

Title (en)

Wedge clamp for belt driven elevator

Title (de)

Riemenendverbindung für ein Riemenende einer Aufzugsanlage

Title (fr)

Attache pour ascenseur à ruban

Publication

EP 1634842 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 05108148 A

Priority

  • EP 04021670 A
  • EP 05108148 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2006054468A1] A belt end connection for fastening a support belt end in an elevator installation and a method for protecting and checking a belt end connection in an elevator installation includes a twisting prevention device that prevents twisting of the belt end connection about the longitudinal axis thereof. A wedge retains the support belt end in a wedge pocket and is secured by a loss prevention device against slipping out of the wedge pocket. The twisting prevention device and/or the loss prevention enable efficient protection of the support belt and/or of the belt end connection against damage and make possible efficient checking and control of the belt end connection.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 7/06 (2006.01); B66B 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 7/085 (2013.01); Y10T 24/3909 (2013.01); Y10T 24/3969 (2013.01); Y10T 24/3971 (2013.01); Y10T 24/3996 (2013.01); Y10T 403/4345 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XA] WO 2004069715 A1 20040819 - OTIS ELEVATOR CO [US], et al
  • [A] US 4724929 A 19880216 - COLEMAN JOHN D [US], et al
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 384 (M - 1296) 17 August 1992 (1992-08-17)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 10 30 November 1995 (1995-11-30)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

US 2006054468 A1 20060316; US 7469774 B2 20081230; AR 050738 A1 20061115; AU 2005209671 A1 20060330; AU 2005209671 B2 20110714; BR PI0503823 A 20070522; CA 2518660 A1 20060313; CA 2518660 C 20130514; CA 2783219 A1 20060313; CA 2783219 C 20150113; CN 100540437 C 20090916; CN 1749143 A 20060322; EP 1634842 A2 20060315; EP 1634842 A3 20090218; JP 2006076791 A 20060323; JP 5096670 B2 20121212; NO 20054226 D0 20050912; NO 20054226 L 20060314; NO 341752 B1 20180115; NZ 542101 A 20070223; RU 2005128360 A 20070320; RU 2383487 C2 20100310; US 2009127032 A1 20090521; US 7740113 B2 20100622; ZA 200506660 B 20060531

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091009

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-09-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090729

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU

2006-12-08 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1089740

2006-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU