EP 1635415 A1 20060315 - Fuel cell stack
Title (en)
Fuel cell stack
Title (de)
Brennstoffzellenstapel
Title (fr)
Empilage de piles à combustible
Publication
Application
Priority
- KR 20040071655 A 20040908
- KR 20050033117 A 20050421
- KR 20050033118 A 20050421
- KR 20050033124 A 20050421
Abstract (en)
A fuel cell stack includes at least one electricity generating element that generates electrical energy through a reaction of fuel and oxygen, the electricity generating element including a membrane-electrode assembly, separators respectively positioned at both sides of the membrane-electrode assembly, and conducting elements respectively positioned between the separators and the membrane-electrode assembly and capable of enabling electrons, which are generated in the membrane-electrode assembly, to transfer through the fuel cell stack.
IPC 8 full level
H01M 8/24 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
H01M 8/0234 (2013.01 - EP US); H01M 8/0256 (2013.01 - EP US); H01M 8/0258 (2013.01 - US); H01M 8/0273 (2013.01 - US); H01M 8/0276 (2013.01 - EP); H01M 8/241 (2013.01 - US); H01M 8/0206 (2013.01 - EP US); H01M 8/0221 (2013.01 - EP US); Y02E 60/50 (2013.01 - EP)
Citation (search report)
- [Y] EP 1437782 A1 20040714 - HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]
- [Y] WO 03100900 A1 20031204 - IDATECH LLC [US], et al
- [Y] EP 1246289 A2 20021002 - SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]
- [Y] EP 1441405 A2 20040728 - HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]
- [Y] US 2002061430 A1 20020523 - WAKAHOI TOSHIYA [JP], et al
- [Y] US 2002192522 A1 20021219 - WADA MIKIO [JP], et al
- [Y] WO 03054996 A1 20030703 - AVISTA LAB INC [US], et al
- [YD] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 09 30 September 1996 (1996-09-30)
- [YD] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 09 13 October 2000 (2000-10-13)
- [YD] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 290 (E - 1557) 2 June 1994 (1994-06-02)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
DE FR GB
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1635415 A1 20060315; JP 2006080084 A 20060323; JP 4845459 B2 20111228; US 2006051626 A1 20060309
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 05108146 A 20050906; JP 2005261167 A 20050908; US 22115705 A 20050906