Global Patent Index - EP 1637635 B1

EP 1637635 B1 2007-10-31 - Method for driving the gripper heads of a gripper loom and device therefor

Title (en)

Method for driving the gripper heads of a gripper loom and device therefor

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Antreiben von Greiferköpfen einer Greiferwebmaschine und Antriebsvorrichtung dafür

Title (fr)

Procédé d'entraînement des têtes de pinces d'un métier à pinces et dispositif pour sa mise en oeuvre

Publication

EP 1637635 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 04021688 A

Priority

EP 04021688 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1637635A1] In a method for driving gripper heads in gripper looms by servo-motors (3) directly driving the gripper carrier guiding the heads via cog wheels and supplied with motion control data dependent on successively activatable signals from a control unit, (a) the motors are alternating or multiphase current motors of rated speed 3000 rpm or more and intrinsic inertia less than 0.006 kg.m2>, (b) starting control data are retrievably stored as standardized transfer functions and motion parameters, (c) the activatable signals are high resolution rotation angle signals for the loom main shaft (11) and (d) the transfer functions and motion parameters for issuing motor control signals are retrieved simultaneously (individually or as stored combinations). An independent claim is included for a drive mechanism for gripper heads in gripper looms, comprising: servo-motors (3) outside the fabric former and having drive wheels (34) mounted on the shafts; gripper carriers (21) for guiding the gripper heads (2) into and out of the fabric former, acted on by the drive wheels of the servo-motors via cog elements; and a control unit and memory for supplying with motion control data to the servo-motors, the angle supplier (121) on the main shaft (11) of the loom and the angle supplier (32) on the axes of the servo-motors. The novel features are that: (1) the servo-motors (3) are alternating or multiphase current motors of rated speed 3000-7000 (preferably 550-6500) rpm and maximum rotational moment 140-200 Nm; (2) the angle suppliers on the main shaft and/or the axes of the servo-motors have more than 50 support sites per revolution; and (3) the intrinsic inertia of the moving parts of each servo-motor is less than 0.006 kg.m2>.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/27 (2006.01); D03D 47/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/18 (2013.01); D03D 47/23 (2013.01); D03D 47/272 (2013.01); D03D 47/273 (2013.01); D03D 47/275 (2013.01); D03D 51/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE IT LI TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1637635 A1 20060322; EP 1637635 B1 20071031; DE 502004005368 D1 20071213

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160923

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160928

- Year of fee payment: 13

2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160927

- Year of fee payment: 13

2016-12-30 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20160824

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-10-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080801

2007-12-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502004005368 P 20071213

2007-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE IT LI TR

2006-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE IT LI TR

2006-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050921

2006-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK