Global Patent Index - EP 1639207 B1

EP 1639207 B1 2009-02-11 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DISLODGING AND RECOVERING DREDGING MATERIAL

Title (en)

DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DISLODGING AND RECOVERING DREDGING MATERIAL

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM HERAUSLÖSEN UND WIEDERGEWINNEN VON BAGGERGUT

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE DRAGAGE ET DE RECUPERATION DE MATERIAUX DE DRAGAGE

Publication

EP 1639207 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 04737669 A

Priority

  • BE 2004000085 W
  • BE 200300356 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2004111354A1] Device for dislodging and recovering dredging material, comprising a drive shaft (11) for rotatingly driving a cutter head (5), and a suction pipe (13) arranged close to the cutter head, wherein the cutter head is partially enclosed by at least one hood-like cover (15, 16), which cover is adapted to at least partially prevent mixing of the dislodged dredging material with the surrounding fluid.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02F 3/92 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02F 3/9212 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 2004111354 A1 20041223; BE 1015566 A5 20050607; EP 1639207 A1 20060329; EP 1639207 B1 20090211

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120702

2013-03-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120610

2013-01-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130101

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110628

- Year of fee payment: 8

2011-12-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110702

- Year of fee payment: 8

2011-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110715

- Year of fee payment: 8

2010-01-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091112

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR IT NL

2006-09-20 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2006-09-20 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): FR IT NL

2006-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060105

2006-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): FR IT NL