Global Patent Index - EP 1639723 A4

EP 1639723 A4 2007-10-24 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR COMMUNICATION OF GPS EPHEMERIS

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR COMMUNICATION OF GPS EPHEMERIS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERMITTLUNG VON GPS-EPHEMERIS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION D'EPHEMERIDES GPS

Publication

EP 1639723 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 04750873 A

Priority

  • US 2004013201 W
  • US 48320903 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2005006593A1] Satellite ephemeris data associated with satellite vehicles in a Global Positioning System (GPS) based position location system can be selectively transmitted to a mobile station within a wireless communication system. The mobile station can selectively request satellite ephemeris data from a Position Determination Entity (PDE) that is in communication with one or more GPS satellite vehicles (SV). The mobile station forecasts the satellite vehicles that theoretically are available. Then, the mobile station checks to see if valid ephemeris data is locally stored. If ephemeris data is desired and not locally available, the mobile station transmits a selective ephemeris request to the PDE and receives, in response to the request, the ephemeris corresponding to the SV identified in the ephemeris request. The selective ephemeris request and selective satellite update method can be implemented in accordance with presently available position location standards.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04B 7/185 (2006.01); G01S 1/00 (2006.01); G01S 19/05 (2010.01); G01S 19/25 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01S 19/258 (2013.01); G01S 19/05 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2005006593 A1 20050120; BR PI0411920 A 20060829; CN 1930791 A 20070314; EP 1639723 A1 20060329; EP 1639723 A4 20071024; JP 2007521481 A 20070802; JP 2011047946 A 20110310; KR 20060065590 A 20060614; MX PA05014053 A 20060309

INPADOC legal status


2012-04-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20111101

2008-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080502

2007-10-24 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20070924

2007-03-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROH, MARK,C/O QUALCOMM INC.

2007-03-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROW, CHANG,C/O QUALCOMM INC.

2007-03-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WONG, JEFF

2006-10-04 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2006-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20051217

2006-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR