EP 1640162 A1 20060329 - Inkjet nozzle arrangement having paddle forming a portion of a wall
Title (en)
Inkjet nozzle arrangement having paddle forming a portion of a wall
Title (de)
Tintenstrahldüsenanordnung mit Paddeln als Teil der Wandung
Title (fr)
Buse de jet d'encre avec des pagaies formant une part du mur
Publication
Application
Priority
- EP 98933352 A 19980715
- AU PO807897 A 19970715
- AU PO793397 A 19970715
- AU PO807597 A 19970715
- AU PO807997 A 19970715
- AU PO805097 A 19970715
- AU PO805297 A 19970715
- AU PO794897 A 19970715
- AU PO795197 A 19970715
- AU PO807497 A 19970715
- AU PO794197 A 19970715
- AU PO805197 A 19970715
- AU PO804597 A 19970715
- AU PO795297 A 19970715
- AU PO804697 A 19970715
- AU PO804297 A 19970715
- AU PO804097 A 19970715
- AU PO805797 A 19970715
- AU PO805697 A 19970715
- AU PO800197 A 19970715
- AU PO803897 A 19970715
- AU PO793797 A 19970715
- AU PO800297 A 19970715
- AU PO806897 A 19970715
- AU PO806297 A 19970715
- AU PO803497 A 19970715
- AU PO803997 A 19970715
- AU PO803797 A 19970715
- AU PO804397 A 19970715
- AU PO806497 A 19970715
- AU PO794697 A 19970715
- AU PO794397 A 19970715
- AU PO800697 A 19970715
- AU PO800797 A 19970715
- AU PO800897 A 19970715
- AU PO801097 A 19970715
- AU PO794497 A 19970715
- AU PO794797 A 19970715
- AU PO794597 A 19970715
- AU PO803397 A 19970715
- AU PO801197 A 19970715
- AU PO850397 A 19970811
- AU PO939097 A 19970923
- AU PO939397 A 19970923
- AU PO939297 A 19970923
- AU PO938997 A 19970923
- AU PO939197 A 19970923
- AU PP087397 A 19971212
- AU PP089397 A 19971212
- AU PP088897 A 19971212
- AU PP089197 A 19971212
- AU PP089097 A 19971212
- AU PP089497 A 19971212
- AU PP088997 A 19971212
- AU PP087297 A 19971212
- AU PP088297 A 19971212
- AU PP087497 A 19971212
- AU PP087597 A 19971212
- AU PP089297 A 19971212
- AU PP139898 A 19980119
- AU PP139698 A 19980119
- AU PP259398 A 19980325
- AU PP259298 A 19980325
- AU PP259198 A 19980325
- AU PP399198 A 19980609
- AU PP398398 A 19980609
- AU PP398598 A 19980609
- AU PP398998 A 19980609
- AU PP398798 A 19980609
- AU PP399098 A 19980609
- AU PP398698 A 19980609
- AU PP398498 A 19980609
Abstract (en)
An inkjet nozzle arrangement for a printhead is provided. The nozzle arrangement comprises a nozzle chamber for storing ink to be ejected, at least one moveable actuator paddle forming at least a portion of a first wall of said nozzle chamber, and an ink ejection nozzle defined in the first wall. Actuation of the actuator paddle causes ejection of ink from the nozzle.
IPC 8 full level
B41J 2/045 (2006.01); B41J 2/055 (2006.01); B41J 2/14 (2006.01); B41J 2/16 (2006.01); B41J 2/165 (2006.01); B41J 2/175 (2006.01); B41J 2/19 (2006.01); B41J 3/42 (2006.01); B41J 3/44 (2006.01); H01H 1/00 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
B41J 2/14314 (2013.01); B41J 2/14427 (2013.01); B41J 2/1623 (2013.01); B41J 2/1628 (2013.01); B41J 2/1629 (2013.01); B41J 2/1631 (2013.01); B41J 2/1632 (2013.01); B41J 2/1635 (2013.01); B41J 2/1639 (2013.01); B41J 2/1642 (2013.01); B41J 2/1643 (2013.01); B41J 2/1645 (2013.01); B41J 2/1646 (2013.01); B41J 2/1648 (2013.01); B41J 2/17596 (2013.01); B41J 3/445 (2013.01); B41J 2002/041 (2013.01)
Citation (applicant)
- US 1941001 A 19331226 - HANSELL CLARENCE W
- US 3596275 A 19710727 - SWEET RICHARD G
- US 3373437 A 19680312 - SWEET RICHARD G, et al
- US 3946398 A 19760323 - KYSER EDMOND L, et al
- US 3683212 A 19720808 - ZOLTAN STEVEN I
- US 3747120 A 19730717 - STEMME N
- US 4459601 A 19840710 - HOWKINS STUART D [US]
- US 4584590 A 19860422 - FISCHBECK KENNETH H [US], et al
- GB 2007162 A 19790516 - CANON KK
- US 4490728 A 19841225 - VAUGHT JOHN L [US], et al
- US 4899181 A 19900206 - HAWKINS WILLIAM G [US], et al
- US 5208604 A 19930504 - WATANABE TAKASHI [JP], et al
- J MOORE: "Non-Impact Printing: Introduction and Historical Perspective", OUTPUT HARD COPY DEVICES, 1988, pages 207 - 220
- HEWLETT-PACKARD JOURNAL, vol. 36, no. 5, 1985, pages 33 - 37
- HEWLETT-PACKARD JOURNAL, vol. 36, no. 5, 1985, pages 33 - 37
- SPIE (INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, vol. 2642 AND
- SPIE (INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, vol. 2642 AND
- SPIE (INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, vol. 2642 AND
- SPIE (INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, vol. 2642 AND
- SPIE (INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, vol. 2642 AND
- SPIE (INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, vol. 2642 AND
- TANS: "Individual single-wall carbon nano-tubes as quantum wires", NATURE, vol. 386, 3 April 1997 (1997-04-03), pages 474 - 477
- SPIE (INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, vol. 2642 AND
- T. ROSENMAYER; H. WU: "PTFE nanoemulsions as spinon, low dielectric constant materials for ULSI applications", ADVANCED METALLISATION FOR FUTURE ULSI, MRS, vol. 427, 1996, pages 463 - 468
- BERENSCHOT: "Thermally assisted Ian Beam Etching of polytetrafluoroethylene: A new technique for High Aspect Ratio Etching of MEMS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NINTH ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON MICRO ELECTRO MECHANICAL SYSTEMS, February 1996 (1996-02-01)
- J.K. BHARDWAJ; H. ASHRAF: "Advanced Silicon Etching Using High Density Plasmas", SPIE PROCEEDINGS IN MICRO MACHINING AND MICRO FABRICATION PROCESS TECHNOLOGY, vol. 2639, pages 224
- J.K. BHARDWAJ; H. ASHRAF: "Advanced Silicon Etching Using High Density Plasmas", SPIE PROCEEDINGS IN MICRO MACHINING AND MICRO FABRICATION PROCESS TECHNOLOGY, vol. 2639, pages 224
- J.K. BHARDWAJ; H. ASHRAF: "Advanced Silicon Etching Using High Density Plasmas", SPIE PROCEEDINGS IN MICRO MACHINING AND MICRO FABRICATION PROCESS TECHNOLOGY, vol. 2639, pages 224
- SPIE (INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, vol. 2642 AND
- SPIE (INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, vol. 2642 AND
- SPIE (INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, vol. 2642 AND
- SPIE (INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, vol. 2642 AND
- SPIE (INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, vol. 2642 AND
- SPIE (INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, vol. 2642 AND
Citation (search report)
- [A] EP 0510648 A2 19921028 - IVRI YEHUDA [US]
- [A] WO 9712689 A1 19970410 - UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]
- [A] EP 0478956 A2 19920408 - KERNFORSCHUNGSZ KARLSRUHE [DE]
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 04 30 April 1996 (1996-04-30)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 217 (M - 0970) 8 May 1990 (1990-05-08)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 9903681 A1 19990128; AT E358019 T1 20070415; AT E359915 T1 20070515; AT E386638 T1 20080315; AT E409119 T1 20081015; EP 0999934 A1 20000517; EP 0999934 A4 20010627; EP 0999934 B1 20051026; EP 1637330 A1 20060322; EP 1637330 B1 20070418; EP 1640162 A1 20060329; EP 1640162 B1 20070328; EP 1650030 A1 20060426; EP 1650030 B1 20080924; EP 1650031 A1 20060426; EP 1650031 B1 20080220; ES 2302134 T3 20080701; JP 2003521389 A 20030715; JP 4160250 B2 20081001
DOCDB simple family (application)
AU 9800550 W 19980715; AT 05109700 T 19980715; AT 05109701 T 19980715; AT 05109707 T 19980715; AT 05109756 T 19980715; EP 05109700 A 19980715; EP 05109701 A 19980715; EP 05109707 A 19980715; EP 05109756 A 19980715; EP 98933352 A 19980715; ES 05109756 T 19980715; JP 2000502942 A 19980715