Global Patent Index - EP 1640509 B1

EP 1640509 B1 2007-10-17 - Method of making a sloted wall in ground and device therefor

Title (en)

Method of making a sloted wall in ground and device therefor

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Erstellen einer Schlitzwand im Erdboden

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour creuser des tranchées dans le sol

Publication

EP 1640509 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 04019987 A

Priority

EP 04019987 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US7363733B2] The invention relates to a device for making a trench wall in the soil comprising a frame, at least one lower cutting/mixing wheel arranged at the bottom of the frame, at least one further, upper cutting/mixing wheel arranged at the top of the frame, wherein the frame is designed in an intermediate portion between the upper cutting/mixing wheel and the lower cutting/mixing wheel with a smaller cross section with respect to the cutting cross section of the at least one lower cutting/mixing wheel. The invention further relates to a method for making a trench in the soil by means of such a device.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 17/13 (2006.01); E02D 19/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 17/13 (2013.01); E02F 3/205 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

US 2006037218 A1 20060223; US 7363733 B2 20080429; CA 2513826 A1 20060223; CA 2513826 C 20090512; CN 100434599 C 20081119; CN 1739328 A 20060301; DE 502004005279 D1 20071129; EP 1640509 A1 20060329; EP 1640509 B1 20071017; EP 1640509 B2 20140305; JP 2006057446 A 20060302; JP 4109687 B2 20080702; KR 100738896 B1 20070712; KR 20060053194 A 20060519; RU 2005125079 A 20070220; RU 2304197 C2 20070810; SG 120233 A1 20060328

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140901

2015-05-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150430

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140823

2014-04-17 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 502004005279

- Effective date: 20140305

2014-03-05 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20140305

2014-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130821

- Year of fee payment: 10

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130827

- Year of fee payment: 10

2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 502004005279

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130301

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110830

- Year of fee payment: 8

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090823

2010-04-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090823

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080804

- Year of fee payment: 5

2008-08-20 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SOILMEC S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20080711

2008-07-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-11-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502004005279 P 20071129

2007-11-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20071105

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-10-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050411

2006-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK