Global Patent Index - EP 1642661 A4

EP 1642661 A4 2007-10-10 - PROCESS AND SYSTEM FOR PRODUCING GRANULATION POWDER OF RARE EARTH ALLOY AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SINTERED OBJECT OF RARE EARTH ALLOY

Title (en)

PROCESS AND SYSTEM FOR PRODUCING GRANULATION POWDER OF RARE EARTH ALLOY AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SINTERED OBJECT OF RARE EARTH ALLOY

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GRANULIERPULVER EINER SELTENERDENLEGIERUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GESINTERTEN OBJEKTS AUS EINER SELTENERDENLEGIERUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET SYSTEME PERMETTANT DE PRODUIRE UNE POUDRE GRANULAIRE D'ALLIAGE A BASE DE TERRES RARES ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN OBJET FRITTE A BASE DUDIT ALLIAGE DE TERRES RARES

Publication

EP 1642661 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 04734936 A

Priority

  • JP 2004007586 W
  • JP 2003148567 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1642661A1] A method for making a granulated powder according to the present invention includes the steps of: preparing a rare-earth alloy powder with remanent magnetization; feeding the powder onto a track 22, which is defined by a side surface 22a and a lower surface 22b that is sloped so as to decrease its height toward the side surface; and setting up vibrations on the track to give the powder kinetic energy, thereby transporting the powder along the length of the track and granulating the powder under a substantially zero magnetic field by utilizing an agglomeration force produced by the remanent magnetization of the powder and a tumbling action produced by the kinetic energy. As a result, a rare-earth alloy granulated powder, which has good flowability and good compactibility and which makes it possible to produce a magnet with excellent magnetic properties, can be obtained.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22F 3/02 (2006.01); B22F 1/00 (2006.01); B22F 9/04 (2006.01); H01F 1/053 (2006.01); H01F 1/06 (2006.01); H01F 41/02 (2006.01); H01F 1/057 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 41/0273 (2013.01); B22F 9/04 (2013.01); C22C 1/002 (2013.01); B22F 2009/045 (2013.01); B22F 2998/00 (2013.01); C22C 2202/02 (2013.01); H01F 1/0577 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

B22F 2998/00 + C22C 1/0441

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1642661 A1 20060405; EP 1642661 A4 20071010; EP 1642661 B1 20090715; CN 101811191 A 20100825; CN 101811191 B 20110921; CN 1717290 A 20060104; CN 1717290 B 20100811; DE 602004022051 D1 20090827; JP 4910393 B2 20120404; JP WO2004105982 A1 20060720; WO 2004105982 A1 20041209

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-06-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100416

2009-08-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602004022051 P 20090827

2009-07-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2009-02-18 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING GRANULATION POWDER OF RARE EARTH ALLOY AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SINTERED OBJECT OF RARE EARTH ALLOY

2008-03-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HITACHI METALS, LTD.

2008-02-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080118

2007-10-10 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20070911

2007-10-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B22F 3/02 20060101AFI20041214BHEP

2007-10-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B22F 1/00 20060101ALI20070905BHEP

2007-10-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01F 1/06 20060101ALI20070905BHEP

2006-08-30 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2006-08-30 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE

2006-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20051130

2006-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE