Global Patent Index - EP 1643224 B8

EP 1643224 B8 2009-02-18 - Method and apparatus for improved colorimetry

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for improved colorimetry

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung für verbesserte Kolorimetrie

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de colorimétrie améliorée

Publication

EP 1643224 B8 (EN)

Application

EP 05021441 A

Priority

  • US 61425704 P
  • US 65304805 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1643224A2] A colorimeter method and apparatus is described. The colorimeter includes a plurality of sensors/filter systems with non overlapping spectral responses, adequate for providing data capable of translation into standard coordinates system such as, CIE XYZ, CIE L* a* b*, or CIE Luv, as well as non-standard operable coordinate systems. The field of view of the colorimeter is chosen to closely track the response of the human eye using an optical path configured to select and limit the field of view in a manner that is insensitive to placement of the colorimeter on the source image. The optical path from the source image to the sensor is configured to select preferred light rays while rejecting undesirable light rays to maximize the signal/noise ratio. A rearward facing sensor channel is included to simultaneously measure ambient light impinging on the source image and feedback means to provide status and/or change of information.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01J 3/02 (2006.01); G01J 3/51 (2006.01); G01N 21/25 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01J 3/46 (2013.01); G01J 3/02 (2013.01); G01J 3/0291 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1643224 A2 20060405; EP 1643224 A3 20060607; EP 1643224 B1 20081029; EP 1643224 B8 20090218; DE 602005010644 D1 20081211; DE 602005027803 D1 20110616

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170928

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170921

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170921

- Year of fee payment: 13

2015-09-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: X-RITE SWITZERLAND GMBH, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: X-RITE EUROPE GMBH, DE

2015-08-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: X-RITE SWITZERLAND GMBH, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: X-RITE EUROPE GMBH, REGENSDORF, CH

- Document: DE 602005010644

2015-08-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602005010644

- Representative's name: SCHWABE SANDMAIR MARX, DE

2015-08-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602005010644

- Representative's name: SCHWABE SANDMAIR MARX PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANW, DE

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-06-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100531

2009-10-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090730

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081029

2008-12-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602005010644 P 20081211

2008-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2008-10-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-10-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: X-RITE EUROPE GMBH

2007-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2006-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20061019

2006-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU

2006-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU