Global Patent Index - EP 1644319 A4

EP 1644319 A4 2007-10-31 - NOVEL HALO-SUBSTITUTED ACTIVE METHYLENE COMPOUNDS

Title (en)

NOVEL HALO-SUBSTITUTED ACTIVE METHYLENE COMPOUNDS

Title (de)

NEUE HALOGENSUBSTITUIERTE AKTIVE METHYLENVERBINDUNGEN

Title (fr)

NOUVEAUX COMPOSES DE METHYLENE ACTIF HALO-SUBSTITUES

Publication

EP 1644319 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 03817135 A

Priority

IN 0300216 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2004108660A1] A novel process for the preparation of compounds of formula (I) by employing novel halo-substituted active methylene compounds of formula (III) and process of preparation thereof.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07C 235/80 (2006.01); C07C 233/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07C 235/80 (2013.01); C07C 231/12 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C07C 231/12 + C07C 235/80

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2004108660 A1 20041216; AU 2003242989 A1 20050104; EP 1644319 A1 20060412; EP 1644319 A4 20071031; JP 2006527164 A 20061130

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090324

2008-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071126

2007-10-31 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20071002

2007-10-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C07C 235/80 20060101AFI20070926BHEP

2006-09-13 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2006-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20051209

2006-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR