Global Patent Index - EP 1649878 A3

EP 1649878 A3 2007-10-24 - Method of manufacturing globular ceramic particles, method of seeding cells and method of manufacturing product for repairing biological tissues

Title (en)

Method of manufacturing globular ceramic particles, method of seeding cells and method of manufacturing product for repairing biological tissues

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von globulären keramischen Partikeln, Verfahren zur Besiedelung mit Zellen und Verfahren zur Herstellung von Erzeuguissen zur Reparatur von biologischen Gewebe.

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication des particules céramiques globulaires, procédé de culture de cellules et procédé de fabrication de produits pour la réparation de tissus biologiques.

Publication

EP 1649878 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 05021160 A

Priority

JP 2004290224 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1649878A2] To efficiently manufacture globular ceramic particles which can be formed uniformly in surrounding gaps when they are arbitrarily filled into a defect part of biological tissue or the like, without impairing the adhesiveness of cells. There is provided a method of manufacturing globular ceramic particles comprising; containing a predetermined amount of granular shaped ceramic particles inside a cylindrical container 5 that is arranged approximately horizontally, and rotating the cylindrical container about its axis.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61L 27/38 (2006.01); A61L 27/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61L 27/12 (2013.01); A61L 27/38 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1649878 A2 20060426; EP 1649878 A3 20071024; JP 2006101986 A 20060420; US 2006074140 A1 20060406

INPADOC legal status


2008-12-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2008-10-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080425

2008-07-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU

2006-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU