Global Patent Index - EP 1650028 A3

EP 1650028 A3 2009-02-25 - Method for adjusting the cutting register of a rotary printing press

Title (en)

Method for adjusting the cutting register of a rotary printing press

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Schnittregisterregelung bei einer Rollenrotationsdruckmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé du repérage de coupe d'une rotative à bobines

Publication

EP 1650028 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 05022841 A

Priority

DE 102004051634 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1650028A2] The method involves setting the cutting position of a print substrate web (2) by adjusting the circumferential speed of a pull unit such as a printing unit which conveys the web. The circumferential speed on all the pull units which are downstream of the pull unit in the running direction of the web that conveys only the web or a portion of the web, are adjusted simultaneously.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/60 (2006.01); B41F 13/02 (2006.01); B65H 23/188 (2006.01); B65H 23/192 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 23/1882 (2013.01); B41F 13/025 (2013.01); B41F 13/60 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4148 (2013.01); B65H 2301/5151 (2013.01); B65H 2801/21 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1650028 A2 20060426; EP 1650028 A3 20090225; DE 102004051634 A1 20060518; US 2006102026 A1 20060518; US 7481163 B2 20090127

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-07 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140311

2013-11-27 [19W] RESUMPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS)

- Effective date: 20140203

2012-03-21 [19U] INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20120201

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2009-10-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090914

2009-09-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090813

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU

2009-02-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B41F 13/60 20060101AFI20060110BHEP

2009-02-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B41F 13/02 20060101ALI20090116BHEP

2009-02-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65H 23/188 20060101ALI20090116BHEP

2009-02-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65H 23/192 20060101ALI20090116BHEP

2008-07-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MANROLAND AG

2006-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU