Global Patent Index - EP 1652135 A4

EP 1652135 A4 2009-02-04 - AN ELECTRONIC TRANSACTION SYSTEM

Title (en)

AN ELECTRONIC TRANSACTION SYSTEM

Title (de)

SYSTEM FÜR ELEKTRONISCHE TRANSAKTIONEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE TRANSACTION ELECTRONIQUE

Publication

EP 1652135 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 04737476 A

Priority

  • AU 2004000855 W
  • AU 0300846 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2005001725A1] An electronic transaction system comprising a host server; at least one transaction device; at least one service provider system; and a content management system. When a transaction device issues a client request to the host server for one or more of the electronic goods and/or services, the host server operates to generate a client response in reply to the client request. In generating the client response a service request may be issued to the at least one service provider system. Also includes a matrix recording a set of permissions and/or constraints applicable to the electronic transaction system. The content management system references the matrix in determining the content to be provided to each transaction device to ensure that the set of permissions and/or constraints are complied with. Each transaction device further receives a set of unique identifiers from the host server, each identifier representing a component of the content.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 10/00 (2012.01); G06Q 20/00 (2012.01); G06Q 30/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 20/04 (2013.01); G06Q 10/087 (2013.01); G06Q 20/12 (2013.01); G06Q 30/06 (2013.01); G06Q 30/0603 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2005001725 A1 20050106; WO 2005001725 A9 20050217; EP 1652135 A1 20060503; EP 1652135 A4 20090204

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090520

2009-02-04 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090109

2007-05-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: COURSE, PHILIP

2007-05-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MCCREATH, GREGORY, DOUGLAS

2006-10-04 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2006-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060127

2006-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR