EP 1653089 A1 20060503 - Device for determining the position of a moving piston rod with respect to a cylinder
Title (en)
Device for determining the position of a moving piston rod with respect to a cylinder
Title (de)
Einrichtung zur Erfassung der Position einer beweglichen Kolbenstange gegenüber einem Zylinder
Title (fr)
Dispositif pour la détermination de la position d'une tige mobile par rapport à un cylindre
Publication
Application
Priority
US 97433004 A 20041027
Abstract (en)
Shaft`s axial position detecting method involves providing a shaft (28) with a metallic region from a surface of the shaft to a radial depth from the surface at a longitudinal position. An eddy current is sensed to detect an alignment of one of two hardened metallic regions with a fixed sensing region at a respective time. A longitudinal position of the shaft is determined with respect to a cylinder (12) at the respective time based on the sensed current. An independent claim is also included for a system for detecting a position of a movable unit associated with a cylinder.
IPC 8 full level
F15B 15/28 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
F15B 15/2846 (2013.01 - EP US); F15B 15/2861 (2013.01 - EP US); F15B 15/2869 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [A] EP 0618373 A1 19941005 - HYDRAUDYNE CYLINDERS BV [NL]
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 382 (P - 1257) 26 September 1991 (1991-09-26)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 082 (M - 1215) 27 February 1992 (1992-02-27)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 195 (P - 1039) 20 April 1990 (1990-04-20)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 378 (M - 1011) 15 August 1990 (1990-08-15)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
DE GB
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1653089 A1 20060503; EP 1653089 B1 20081231; DE 502005006367 D1 20090212; US 2006087313 A1 20060427; US 7116097 B2 20061003
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 05109726 A 20051019; DE 502005006367 T 20051019; US 97433004 A 20041027