Global Patent Index - EP 1654391 A4

EP 1654391 A4 2009-02-18 - BIOMASS GENERATOR

Title (en)

BIOMASS GENERATOR

Title (de)

BIOMASSENGENERATOR

Title (fr)

GENERATEUR DE BIOMASSE

Publication

EP 1654391 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 04752627 A

Priority

  • US 2004015638 W
  • US 63633903 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2005032032A1] A biomass generator useful for continuously growing and withdrawing bacteria to be used in a desired beneficial application, the generator having a bacteria growth chamber; water and nutrient inlet ports; upper and lower outlet ports; a recirculating pump withdrawing and reintroducing fluid to establish a vortex in the growth chamber while controlling foaming and pump cavitation; a low pressure air inlet line discharging air inside the growth chamber above the vortex; a fluid discharge line receiving bacteria-containing fluid from the upper outlet port of the growth chamber; a flush line discharging wash water into the fluid discharge line; and an electrical controller cooperating with solenoid-operated valves and a feeder mechanism to periodically introduce water and nutrients into the chamber, thereby simultaneously causing bacteria-containing fluid to be discharged from the growth chamber through the upper outlet port. A method for growing bacteria using the subject apparatus is also disclosed.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12Q 3/00 (2006.01); C12M 1/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12M 41/00 (2013.01); C12M 23/42 (2013.01); C12M 41/12 (2013.01); Y10S 435/813 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

US 2005032032 A1 20050210; US 7081361 B2 20060725; AU 2004265575 A1 20050224; AU 2004265575 B2 20090917; CN 1833035 A 20060913; CN 1833035 B 20100922; EP 1654391 A2 20060510; EP 1654391 A4 20090218; EP 1654391 B1 20130313; JP 2007501613 A 20070201; JP 4500813 B2 20100714; KR 100767207 B1 20071017; KR 20060086350 A 20060731; US 2006078982 A1 20060413; US 2010099165 A1 20100422; US 7635587 B2 20091222; US 8093040 B2 20120110; WO 2005017178 A2 20050224; WO 2005017178 A3 20050526

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171201

2018-03-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180131

2017-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 602004041345

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170302

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 13

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 13

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 13

2016-05-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-03-27 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602004041345

- Effective date: 20131216

2014-02-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20131216

2013-05-08 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602004041345

- Effective date: 20130508

2013-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2013-03-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2011-08-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20110722

2009-02-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090120

2006-11-15 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2006-11-15 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060307

2006-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT