EP 1655263 A1 20060510 - Industrial vehicle with display for presentation of preferably graphical information
Title (en)
Industrial vehicle with display for presentation of preferably graphical information
Title (de)
Flurförderzeug mit mindestens einem Anzeigeelement zur Darstellung vorzugsweise grafischer Informationen
Title (fr)
Chariot industriel au moins un élément de signalisation pour la présentation de préférence d'information graphiques
Publication
Application
Priority
DE 102004049695 A 20041012
Abstract (en)
A comparatively large screen (8) is positioned in front of the operator providing him with information about the condition of the device and facilitating a correction or similar operation to be performed by touching the appropriate area (9, 11, 12, 13) of the screen (8). A servicing and operating manual (11a, 11b) can be accessed by pressing an additional key (10). The text can be provided in various languages to select from. A technician can use an integrated interface (14) for connecting the device to a test unit.
IPC 8 full level
B66F 9/20 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
B66F 9/0759 (2013.01); B66F 9/24 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [X] US 5579227 A 19961126 - SIMMONS JR JAMES M [US], et al
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 08 30 June 1998 (1998-06-30)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 25 12 April 2001 (2001-04-12)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2003, no. 07 3 July 2003 (2003-07-03)
- [A] DATABASE WPI Section PQ Week 200520, Derwent World Patents Index; Class Q17, AN 2002-495991, XP002361922
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DE 102004049695 A1 20060413; EP 1655263 A1 20060510; EP 1655263 B1 20150527
DOCDB simple family (application)
DE 102004049695 A 20041012; EP 05021044 A 20050927