EP 1655562 A3 20060726 - Apparatus for controlling container of refrigerator and method thereof
Title (en)
Apparatus for controlling container of refrigerator and method thereof
Title (de)
Vorrichtung zur Steuerung einer Kühlschrankbehälter und Verfahren dafür
Title (fr)
Dispositif pour commander un récipient d'une armoire frigorifique et son procédé de commande
Publication
Application
Priority
KR 20040091031 A 20041109
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP1655562A2] Disclosed are an apparatus for controlling a container of a refrigerator and a method thereof. The apparatus comprises: a body (11) having an upper cooling chamber and a lower cooling chamber having an opened front surface and separated from each other; an upper door (14) for opening and closing the opened front surface of the upper cooling chamber; a lower door (41) for opening and closing the opened front surface of the lower cooling chamber by being slid in a back and forth direction of the body; a lower container (32) formed at a rear surface of the lower door to be movable in an up and down direction of the body and integrally slid with the lower door; a plurality of upper containers (18-1,18-2) slidable in a back and forth direction of the body and formed at the rear surface of the lower door and at an upper portion of the lower container; and a control means for controlling the lower container (32) to be lifted or lowered.
IPC 8 full level
F25D 25/02 (2006.01); A47B 88/00 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP KR US)
F25D 23/02 (2013.01 - KR); F25D 25/00 (2013.01 - KR); F25D 25/025 (2013.01 - EP US); F25D 25/04 (2013.01 - EP US); F25D 2500/02 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [A] FR 2666729 A1 19920320 - BAILLY ALAIN
- [A] US 3033636 A 19620508 - WURTZ CLIFFORD H, et al
- [A] DE 29701227 U1 19970430 - TIAW THUERINGER INST FUER AKAD [DE]
- [A] US 2855262 A 19581007 - SHARPE VERLOS G
- [A] US 2003173882 A1 20030918 - KOONS BILL J [US]
- [A] DE 2461853 A1 19760708 - SCHWALM LIESELOTTE
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 094 (M - 1561) 16 February 1994 (1994-02-16)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2002, no. 02 2 April 2002 (2002-04-02)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2002, no. 04 4 August 2002 (2002-08-04)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 21 3 August 2001 (2001-08-03)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1655562 A2 20060510; EP 1655562 A3 20060726; AU 2004242446 A1 20060525; AU 2004242446 B2 20070118; CN 100404986 C 20080723; CN 1773202 A 20060517; KR 100619757 B1 20060907; KR 20060042449 A 20060515; US 2006096304 A1 20060511
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 04078482 A 20041222; AU 2004242446 A 20041222; CN 200510005550 A 20050120; KR 20040091031 A 20041109; US 2864505 A 20050105