Global Patent Index - EP 1657006 B1

EP 1657006 B1 2007-10-03 - Drawing die with stabilizer

Title (en)

Drawing die with stabilizer

Title (de)

Ziehwerkzeug mit einem Stabilizator

Title (fr)

Outil d'emboutissage avec un dispositif stabilisateur

Publication

EP 1657006 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 05110559 A

Priority

JP 2004331854 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1657006A1] An object of the invention is to standardize a stabilizer of a drawing die, to easily manufacture and to achieve a cost reduction. The invention provides a stabilizer of a drawing die that includes a punch (2), a blank holder (3) outside fitted to the punch (2) and supported by a cushion pin (4) and provided so as to freely move upward and downward, and a die (7) arranged so as to face to the punch (2) and moves upward and downward, and with which a thin plate (51) mounted on the blank holder (3) moved upward by the cushion pin (4) and pinched between the blank holder (3) and the die (7) by moving the die (7) downward is drawn by the punch (2), wherein a plurality of boxes (5) are arranged around the blank holder (3) between the cushion pin (4) and the blank holder (3) so as to be freely moved upward and downward by the cushion pin, a buffer gas spring (11) is interposed between the boxes (5) and the blank holder (3) so as to form a run-up gap of the blank holder (3) between the boxes (5) and the blank holder (3), a run-up lever (13) pressing the blank holder (3) so as to make the blank holder (3) run up before the die (7) comes into collision with the thin plate (51) on the blank holder (3) is rotatably provided in the boxes (5), and a driver (31) driving the run-up lever (13) is arranged at a position facing to the run-up lever (13) of the die (7), whereby the die (7) comes into collision with the thin plate (51) on the blank holder (3) after the blank holder (3) runs up.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 24/02 (2006.01); B21D 24/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 24/12 (2013.01); B21D 24/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1657006 A1 20060517; EP 1657006 B1 20071003; CA 2527151 A1 20060516; DE 05110559 T1 20061005; DE 602005002714 D1 20071115; ES 2261109 T1 20061116; JP 2006142308 A 20060608; US 2006101888 A1 20060518

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2009-09-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090731

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080104

2008-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080704

2008-05-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071120

- Year of fee payment: 3

2007-11-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602005002714 P 20071115

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2007-02-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2007-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES

2006-10-05 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

2006-08-25 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

2006-07-04 [REG SE TRCL] SWEDISH TRANSLATION OF THE CLAIMS HAVE BEEN FILED

2006-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060301

2006-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU