Global Patent Index - EP 1658780 A3

EP 1658780 A3 2009-02-11 - Apparatus for card receival and wallet with the same

Title (en)

Apparatus for card receival and wallet with the same

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Aufnehmen von Karten und Brieftasche mit derselben

Title (fr)

Dispositif de réception de cartes et portefeuille muni d'un tel dispositif

Publication

EP 1658780 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 05008270 A

Priority

CN 200420953381 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1658780A2] An apparatus for card receival comprises a foldaway portion (70); a leather element (2); and two fence elements (3); wherein the foldaway portion (70) has its two ends to connect with the two ends of the leather element (2); the two fence elements (3) connecting with the foldaway portion (70) by one side thereof; the leather element (2) comprising a plurality of card receival units (21), each of which constituting by a plurality of bar openings (211) for cards inserting. As an embodiment, the card receival units (21) are arranged at intervals. The apparatus for card receival may further comprise a coin-receiving bag (4) formed on an outer side of the foldaway portion. The invention also discloses a wallet with such an apparatus for card receival.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45C 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45C 1/08 (2013.01); A45C 2001/083 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR LV MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1658780 A2 20060524; EP 1658780 A3 20090211

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2010-02-24 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090812

2009-10-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR LV MK YU

2006-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR LV MK YU