Global Patent Index - EP 1660353 A4

EP 1660353 A4 2007-10-10 - STEERING WHEEL

Title (en)

STEERING WHEEL

Title (de)

LENKRAD

Title (fr)

VOLANT

Publication

EP 1660353 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 04783520 A

Priority

  • US 2004029302 W
  • US 50002803 P
  • US 91985304 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2005023591A2] A steering wheel (20) has an annular rim (36). The rim includes a first section (37) and a second section (39), each of which is at least partially covered by a fill material (60). A plurality of first attachment components (40) are provided as an integral element on the second section of the rim (36). Each of the first attachment components (40) extends above a designated surface (45, 145) of the rim. The fill material (60) covers the second section of the rim (36). The fill material forms a cavity (72) about each first attachment component (40) thereby providing easy access to the first attachment component. A shell (102) has an arcuately shaped body (112) with a plurality of second attachment components (106) extending therefrom for snap engagement with corresponding first attachment components (40).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B62D 1/04 (2006.01); B62D 1/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B62D 1/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2005023591 A2 20050317; WO 2005023591 A3 20061207; EP 1660353 A2 20060531; EP 1660353 A4 20071010

INPADOC legal status


2009-12-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090624

2007-10-10 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20070911

2007-07-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B62D 1/04 20060101AFI20070611BHEP

2006-12-13 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2006-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060220

2006-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK