Global Patent Index - EP 1661626 B1

EP 1661626 B1 2009-02-18 - Disc separator

Title (en)

Disc separator

Title (de)

Tellerseparator

Title (fr)

Séparateur à disques

Publication

EP 1661626 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 05111221 A

Priority

DE 102004057411 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1661626A1] A disc separator for removing impurities from a fluid, in which the fluid flows inwards from the dirt-collecting space in the stator between the discs on the rotor to a central channel and then to the outlet, the dirt-collecting space being divided axially by choke points into at least two sub-spaces from which the fluid flows in parallel streams as above. A disc separator for removing impurities from a fluid, comprising a rotor (2) with several axially-stacked discs (5) and a stator (3) with a dirt-collecting space (6) enclosing the rotor. The fluid path (7) proceeds from an inlet (8) to the collecting space (6), radially inwards between the discs (5) to a central run-off channel (9) and then out through an outlet (10); the collecting space (6) is divided axially by means of at least one choke point (11) into at least two sub-spaces (6a, 6b, 6c) from which the fluid flows in parallel streams between the discs (5) to the run-off channel (9). An independent claim is also included for a lubricant circuit for an internal combustion engine, especially in a motor vehicle, in which a single separator (1) as above is used both for main stream cleaning and side stream cleaning.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B04B 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B04B 5/12 (2013.01); B04B 5/005 (2013.01); B04B 7/02 (2013.01); B04B 2005/125 (2013.01); F01M 2001/1035 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1661626 A1 20060531; EP 1661626 B1 20090218; DE 102004057411 A1 20060608; DE 502005006639 D1 20090402

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170601

2017-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161124

2017-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161130

2017-08-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170731

2017-07-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161124

2017-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 502005006639

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160129

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151130

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151130

- Year of fee payment: 11

2015-11-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091119

2009-04-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502005006639 P 20090402

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-02-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070307

2007-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060816

2006-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU