Global Patent Index - EP 1661643 B1

EP 1661643 B1 2009-02-25 - CAST-IRON THIXOCASTING APPARATUS AND METHOD

Title (en)

CAST-IRON THIXOCASTING APPARATUS AND METHOD

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM THIXOGIESSEN VON GUSSEISEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR LE THIXOFORMAGE DE FONTE

Publication

EP 1661643 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 04772054 A

Priority

  • JP 2004012093 W
  • JP 2003301465 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1661643A1] It is an object of the present invention is to provide an apparatus for and a method of thixocasting a cast iron, that can effectively prevent the scale from mixing in the casting (cavity) thereby to obtain sound iron castings having good mechanical properties, by employing a system different from the slide gate system of the prior art. The apparatus for thixocasting a cast iron comprises at least a pair of dies 10, 20 that can freely open and close and constitute a cavity 60 to be filled with semi-molten cast iron under a pressure, and injection means that injects a semi-molten injected material B into the cavity 60 through an injection path 80, while the gate is provided at the entry of the cavity 60 so as to throttle the entry, wherein the gate is constituted from a separate gate member 50 and is disposed at the entry of the cavity 60 every time an injection casting operation is carried out and is taken out together with the casting after the injection casting operation.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 17/22 (2006.01); B22C 9/06 (2006.01); B22C 9/08 (2006.01); B22D 17/00 (2006.01); B22D 17/30 (2006.01); B22D 27/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22C 9/06 (2013.01); B22D 17/007 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1661643 A1 20060531; EP 1661643 A4 20080102; EP 1661643 B1 20090225; DE 602004019661 D1 20090409; JP 2005066663 A 20050317; JP 3686412 B2 20050824; US 2007012415 A1 20070118; WO 2005018852 A1 20050303

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 602004019661

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120831

- Year of fee payment: 9

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110824

2012-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110824

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100818

- Year of fee payment: 7

2010-02-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091126

2009-04-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602004019661 P 20090409

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2009-02-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080314

2008-01-02 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20071204

2006-11-29 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2006-11-29 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2006-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060215

2006-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB