Global Patent Index - EP 1662502 B1

EP 1662502 B1 2009-02-18 - Disk drive having mechanism for preventing tray from rolling

Title (en)

Disk drive having mechanism for preventing tray from rolling

Title (de)

Plattenlaufwerk mit einer Vorrichtung, die ein Schlingern der Ablage verhindert

Title (fr)

Lecteur de disque pourvu d'un mécanisme pour empêcher le roulement du plateau

Publication

EP 1662502 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 05025474 A

Priority

JP 2004343720 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1662502A2] In order to suppress a tray (10) from rolling and to prevent the tray from warping so as to reduce the thickness of a disk drive, the tray (10) is provided on the lower face thereof a substantially L-shaped first cam groove (12) formed on the opposite side to the rack (11) side, and a curved second cam groove (13) formed at a rear end portion of the tray in the neighborhood of the rack; and a rack loading (14) is provided with a first cam rod boss (14a) protruding therefrom and slidably engaging with the first cam groove (12), and a second cam rod boss (14b) protruding therefrom and slidably engaging with the second cam groove (13); so that the entire tray (10) can be well balanced and the mechanical strength can be made uniform in the disk drive.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G11B 17/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11B 17/056 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1662502 A2 20060531; EP 1662502 A3 20070808; EP 1662502 B1 20090218; DE 602005012779 D1 20090402; JP 2006155731 A 20060615; US 2006117329 A1 20060601

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-09-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 602005012779

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-09-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 602005012779

- Effective date: 20110601

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091122

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-08-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100730

2010-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091122

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091229

- Year of fee payment: 5

2010-01-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091119

2009-04-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602005012779 P 20090402

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-02-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-04-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-11-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071029

2007-11-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070920

2007-08-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-08-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU

2006-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU