Global Patent Index - EP 1664055 B9

EP 1664055 B9 2007-10-10 - 9-AMINO-PODOPHYLLOTOXIN DERIVATIVES, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING SAID DERIVATIVES

Title (en)

9-AMINO-PODOPHYLLOTOXIN DERIVATIVES, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING SAID DERIVATIVES

Title (de)

9-AMINOPODOPHYLLOTOXINDERIVATE, VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, DIE DIESE DERIVATE ENTHALTEN

Title (fr)

DERIVES DE 9-AMINO-PODOPHYLLOTOXINE, LEUR PROCEDE DE PREPARATION ET LES COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES QUI LES CONTIENNENT

Publication

EP 1664055 B9 (FR)

Application

EP 04787274 A

Priority

  • FR 2004002218 W
  • FR 0310367 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US7378419B2] The invention relates to compounds of formula (I), wherein R<SUB>1 </SUB>is a group selected from hydrogen, alkyl, aryl, aryalkil, heteroaryl, heteroarylalkyl, alkylcarbonyl, arylcarbonyl, arylalkylcarbonyl, alkoxycarbonyl, aryloxycarbonyl, arylalkoxycarbonyl, heterocycloalkoxycarbonyl, alkylsulfonyl, arylsulfonyl, arylalkylsulfonyl, phosphonic and Si(Ra)<SUB>2</SUB>R<SUB>b</SUB>, Y is a group selected from HN-NH and N-R<SUB>2</SUB>, R<SUB>3 </SUB>is a hydrogen atom, an alkyl, cycloalkyl, aryl, arylalkyl group, R<SUB>4 </SUB>is hydrogen atom or an alkyl group, enantiomers, diastereoisomers and the salts thereof

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 493/04 (2006.01); A61K 31/36 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 493/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

FR 2859208 A1 20050304; FR 2859208 B1 20060120; AR 045549 A1 20051102; CA 2546823 A1 20050317; DE 602004003719 D1 20070125; DE 602004003719 T2 20071018; EP 1664055 A1 20060607; EP 1664055 B1 20061213; EP 1664055 B9 20071010; US 2006247246 A1 20061102; US 7378419 B2 20080527; WO 2005023817 A1 20050317

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 602004003719

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121001

2013-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120930

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120901

2013-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120930

2013-06-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130531

2013-05-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120901

2013-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110927

- Year of fee payment: 8

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110922

- Year of fee payment: 8

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110919

- Year of fee payment: 8

2011-10-28 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (, FR

- Effective date: 20110923

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100909

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-10-29 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2008-09-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNR

- Free text: CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS)#3, RUE MICHEL ANGE#75794 PARIS CEDEX 16 (FR) $ LES LABORATOIRES SERVIER#12, PLACE DE LA DEFENSE#92415 COURBEVOIE CEDEX (FR) -TRANSFER TO- CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS)#3, RUE MICHEL ANGE#75794 PARIS CEDEX 16 (FR)

2007-11-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070914

2007-04-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070315

2007-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MICHELI & CIE INGENIEURS-CONSEILS

2007-01-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602004003719 P 20070125

2006-12-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2006-12-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-12-06 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2006-12-06 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2006-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060320

2006-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI