Global Patent Index - EP 1664350 A4

EP 1664350 A4 2007-10-10 - METHOD FOR SMALL VOLUME NUCLEIC ACID SYNTHESIS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR SMALL VOLUME NUCLEIC ACID SYNTHESIS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR SYNTHESE VON NUKLEINSÄUREN IM KLEINEN VOLUMEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE SYNTHESE DE PETITES QUANTITES D'ACIDES NUCLEIQUES

Publication

EP 1664350 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 04789156 A

Priority

  • US 2004031804 W
  • US 50624703 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2005030984A2] A method for synthesis of nucleic acids, with particular use for synthesis of cDNA. The method allows application of the cDNA to a microarray without the need for concentration or purification of the cDNA post-cDNA synthesis.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07H 21/00 (2006.01); C07H 21/04 (2006.01); C12M 1/36 (2006.01); C12P 19/34 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

C12Q (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/6837 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C12Q 1/6837 + C12Q 2565/1025 + C12Q 2563/179 + C12Q 2525/313

Citation (search report)

[X] WO 0166555 A1 20010913 - DATASCOPE INVESTMENT CORP [US], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2005030984 A2 20050407; WO 2005030984 A3 20051222; EP 1664350 A2 20060607; EP 1664350 A4 20071010; IL 174486 D0 20060801; JP 2007506439 A 20070322

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081213

2008-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080602

2007-10-10 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20070906

2007-10-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C07H 21/00 20060101AFI20070831BHEP

2007-10-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C07H 21/04 20060101ALI20070831BHEP

2007-10-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C12Q 1/68 20060101ALI20070831BHEP

2007-10-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C12M 1/36 20060101ALI20070831BHEP

2007-01-03 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2006-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060310

2006-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK