Global Patent Index - EP 1669112 B1

EP 1669112 B1 2009-02-11 - Binding system for ski

Title (en)

Binding system for ski

Title (de)

Bindungssystem für Skier

Title (fr)

Fixation pour ski

Publication

EP 1669112 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 04029380 A

Priority

EP 04029380 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1669112A1] The binding system involves two connection cheeks which include front cheek (1) and a heel holder (2). The cheeks are connected over a connecting band (5) and are arranged on a support plates (3,4). The ski connection is fastened within the range of one of the connection cheeks, either front cheeks or a heel holder, and is connected to the arranged control device.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 9/003 (2013.01); A63C 9/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1669112 A1 20060614; EP 1669112 B1 20090211; AT 422381 T 20090215; DE 502004008980 D1 20090326

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 14

2018-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 14

2018-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20171220

- Year of fee payment: 14

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 14

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171211

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2015-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091112

2009-03-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502004008980 P 20090326

2009-02-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2007-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070601

2007-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2007-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20061121

2006-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR LV MK YU