Global Patent Index - EP 1670531 A4

EP 1670531 A4 2009-02-18 - INHALER WITH AIR FLOW REGULATION

Title (en)

INHALER WITH AIR FLOW REGULATION

Title (de)

INHALATOR MIT LUFTFLUSSREGELUNG

Title (fr)

INHALATEUR A REGULATION D'ECOULEMENT D'AIR

Publication

EP 1670531 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 03818600 A

Priority

AU 0301206 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2005025654A1] A respiratory delivery system (e.g. an inhaler) used to discharge an appropriate substance therefrom for inhalation by a user. The delivery system includes an airflow regulation assembly (228) that can achieve/maintain a certain flow rate through the inhaler independent of the magnitude of inhalation of the user. The airflow regulation assembly (228) comprises a baffle (232) that moves in a tapered (208) to adjust the size of the passage (208) as the inhalation force varies, thus maintaining a constant airflow rate. The respiratory delivery system may also comprise multiple actuators which discharge an appropriate substance therefrom.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61M 11/04 (2006.01); A24F 47/00 (2006.01); A61M 15/00 (2006.01); A61M 15/02 (2006.01); A61M 15/06 (2006.01); A61M 16/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61M 11/041 (2013.01); A61M 11/042 (2013.01); A61M 15/00 (2013.01); A61M 15/002 (2013.01); A61M 15/0065 (2013.01); A61M 15/025 (2013.01); A61M 15/06 (2013.01); A61M 2016/0021 (2013.01); A61M 2016/0027 (2013.01); A61M 2016/0039 (2013.01); A61M 2205/3306 (2013.01); A61M 2205/52 (2013.01); A61M 2205/6018 (2013.01); A61M 2205/70 (2013.01); A61M 2205/8206 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV MK

EPO simple patent family

WO 2005025654 A1 20050324; AU 2003260166 A1 20050406; EP 1670531 A1 20060621; EP 1670531 A4 20090218; JP 2007505644 A 20070315; JP 4914067 B2 20120411

INPADOC legal status


2015-09-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20150401

2009-05-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090415

2009-02-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090116

2009-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61M 11/04 20060101AFI20090107BHEP

2009-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61M 15/06 20060101ALI20090107BHEP

2009-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61M 15/02 20060101ALI20090107BHEP

2009-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A24F 47/00 20060101ALI20090107BHEP

2006-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060413

2006-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK