Global Patent Index - EP 1671787 B1

EP 1671787 B1 2009-02-11 - Turning bar unit in a rotary printing press

Title (en)

Turning bar unit in a rotary printing press

Title (de)

Wendestangeneinheit für eine Rollenrotationsdruckmaschine

Title (fr)

Unité de barres de retournement dans une machine rotative d'impression

Publication

EP 1671787 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 05027273 A

Priority

DE 102004060725 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1671787A1] Angle bar unit has angle bars (21) arranged one above the other in several levels, whereby channels (2) of printed material are insertable in several levels one above the other in angle bar unit. Channels of printed material are insertable from two sides (24,25) of angle bar unit.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/06 (2006.01); B41F 13/56 (2006.01); B65H 23/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/06 (2013.01); B41F 13/56 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1671787 A1 20060621; EP 1671787 B1 20090211; CN 1799836 A 20060712; DE 102004060725 A1 20060622; DE 502005006598 D1 20090326; US 2006130683 A1 20060622

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20090211

2016-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20090211

2016-04-20 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20151123

2016-03-31 [REG CH PLX] PATENT DECLARED INVALID FROM DATE OF GRANT ONWARDS

2015-11-23 [REG DE R064] EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 502005006598

2015-11-23 [REG DE R103] PATENT REVOKED BY EPO

- Document: DE 502005006598

2015-04-29 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MANROLAND WEB SYSTEMS GMBH

2015-02-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 10

2015-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 10

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141211

- Year of fee payment: 10

2013-11-27 [29W] RESUMPTION OF PROCEEDINGS AFTER GRANT (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS)

- Effective date: 20140203

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111214

2012-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111214

2012-08-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MANROLAND WEB SYSTEMS GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MANROLAND AG, 63075 OFFENBACH, DE

- Document: DE 502005006598

- Effective date: 20120626

2012-03-21 [29U] INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS AFTER GRANT

- Effective date: 20120201

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101221

- Year of fee payment: 6

2009-09-23 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: KOENIG & BAUER AG

- Effective date: 20090812

2009-03-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502005006598 P 20090326

2009-02-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-02-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2009-02-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-07-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MANROLAND AG

2007-02-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2007-02-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070115

2007-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20061218

2006-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU