Global Patent Index - EP 1671804 B1

EP 1671804 B1 2009-02-11 - Radiation curable ink-jet printing process using dotsize control fluid

Title (en)

Radiation curable ink-jet printing process using dotsize control fluid

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Tintenstrahldrucken mit strahlenhärtbarer Tinte bei welchem eine Flüssigkeit zur Kontrolle der Punktgrösse verwendet wird

Title (fr)

Procédé d'impression avec encre durcissable par rayonnement utilisant un liquide pour contrôler la taille des points

Publication

EP 1671804 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 04106632 A

Priority

EP 04106632 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1671804A1] A radiation curable ink-jet printing process is disclosed, exhibiting consistent image quality on a wide variety of different ink-receivers. The ink-receiver is provided with a surface layer using a dotsize control fluid containing a film forming polymeric resin and an inorganic filler in a ratio greater than 3.0.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/00 (2006.01); B41M 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/0011 (2013.01); B41M 5/0029 (2013.01); B41M 7/0081 (2013.01); B41M 5/0047 (2013.01); B41M 5/0058 (2013.01); B41M 5/0064 (2013.01); B41M 5/007 (2013.01); B41M 5/0076 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1671804 A1 20060621; EP 1671804 B1 20090211; AT 425012 T 20090315; CN 1796152 A 20060705; CN 1796152 B 20100505; DE 602004019436 D1 20090326; DE 602005013176 D1 20090423; JP 2006213050 A 20060817

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171116

- Year of fee payment: 14

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171114

- Year of fee payment: 14

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171114

- Year of fee payment: 14

2018-01-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AGFA NV, BE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AGFA GRAPHICS N.V., MORTSEL, BE

- Document: DE 602004019436

2017-11-14 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-12-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2015-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091112

2009-03-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602004019436 P 20090326

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-02-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070426

2007-02-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-02-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA GRAPHICS N.V.

2007-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20061221

2006-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR LV MK YU