Global Patent Index - EP 1671896 B1

EP 1671896 B1 2009-02-18 - Battery package

Title (en)

Battery package

Title (de)

Verpackung für Batterien

Title (fr)

Emballage pour des piles

Publication

EP 1671896 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 05257682 A

Priority

US 1172804 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1671896A1] A point-of-sale blister package for batteries has a plurality of discrete compartments 3, each configured to retain a single respective battery 4. Each compartment 3 is closed by a respective closure portion 7 defined by perforations 6 in the blister card 1. Each closure portion 7 is individually openable to provide a permanent indication that the battery 4 retained in the compartment 3 has been accessed. The compartments 3 also include retaining projections 9 which removably retain the batteries 4 in the compartments 3, even when the closure portion 7 has been removed. Consequently, used batteries can be stored in the opened compartments 3 for later recycling or disposal. The used batteries 4 can be distinguished from the new batteries 4 by the unopened closure portion 7. In a further variant, the compartments 3 are provided in a plastics tray 10 and each compartment 3 is covered by a sealing strip 12 which breaks when the battery 4 is removed from the compartment.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/34 (2006.01); B65D 75/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/367 (2013.01); B65D 2575/367 (2013.01); B65D 2585/88 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1671896 A1 20060621; EP 1671896 B1 20090218; DE 602005012780 D1 20090402; US 2006124506 A1 20060615

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171229

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171227

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171227

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-12-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2016-12-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2015-12-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091119

2009-04-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602005012780 P 20090402

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-02-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-11-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VARTA CONSUMER BATTERIES GMBH & CO., KGAA

2008-10-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FUCHS, JOSEF

2008-10-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GOUJARD, JEAN-PIERRE

2008-10-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: UHL, ALBERT

2008-10-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GLOETZL, KARL-JOHANNES

2008-10-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GOETZ, JOSEF

2007-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070503

2007-02-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20061215

2006-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU