Global Patent Index - EP 1674174 B1

EP 1674174 B1 2009-02-11 - Method for producing a casting mould

Title (en)

Method for producing a casting mould

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Gussform

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'un moule de fonderie

Publication

EP 1674174 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 04030823 A

Priority

EP 04030823 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1674174A1] Preparation of casting mold (16) in which a model of the component to be cast is used in an intermediate step, in which a depression is produced in the surface of the model with introduction of mold material into part of the depression. During casting part of a hole of the component is produced. In a further step the depression is partially filled with a material which produces an internal projection (34) in the mold and further mold projections are then produced.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22C 7/02 (2006.01); B22C 9/04 (2006.01); B22C 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22C 7/02 (2013.01); B22C 9/04 (2013.01); B22C 9/108 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1674174 A1 20060628; EP 1674174 B1 20090211; DE 502004008983 D1 20090326; DE 502004009738 D1 20090820; EP 1920858 A1 20080514; EP 1920858 B1 20090708; US 2006162893 A1 20060727

INPADOC legal status


2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111227

2012-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111231

2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111231

2012-10-18 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 502004008983

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111227

2012-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-05-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110308

- Year of fee payment: 7

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110221

- Year of fee payment: 7

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090211

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101209

- Year of fee payment: 7

2010-01-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091112

2009-05-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2009-03-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502004008983 P 20090326

2009-02-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI

2009-02-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-01-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071221

2007-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI

2006-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060508

2006-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR LV MK YU