Global Patent Index - EP 1675550 A4

EP 1675550 A4 2007-10-10 - THERAPEUTIC REGIMENS FOR ADMINISTERING DRUG COMBINATIONS

Title (en)

THERAPEUTIC REGIMENS FOR ADMINISTERING DRUG COMBINATIONS

Title (de)

THERAPEUTISCHE SCHEMATA ZUR VERABREICHUNG ARZNEIMITTELKOMBINATIONEN

Title (fr)

SCHEMAS POSOLOGIQUES THERAPEUTIQUES POUR UNE ADMINISTRATION DE COMBINAISONS DE MEDICAMENTS

Publication

EP 1675550 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 04788933 A

Priority

  • US 2004031195 W
  • US 67048803 A
  • US 51241503 P
  • US 52044603 P
  • US 77751804 A
  • US 77751704 A
  • US 55749604 P
  • US 94457404 A
  • US 94745504 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2005030132A2] The invention features dosing regimens for the administration of combination therapies, wherein one of the drugs of the combination is formulated for sustained release, or administered repeatedly, and compositions related thereto.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 6/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/565 (2006.01); A61K 38/13 (2006.01); A61K 45/06 (2006.01); A61K 9/00 (2006.01); A61K 9/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/565 (2013.01); A61K 38/13 (2013.01); A61K 45/06 (2013.01); A61K 9/0075 (2013.01); A61K 9/209 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A61K 31/565 + A61K 2300/00
  2. A61K 38/13 + A61K 2300/00

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

HR LT LV

EPO simple patent family

WO 2005030132 A2 20050407; WO 2005030132 A3 20061012; AU 2004275777 A1 20050407; BR PI0414719 A 20061121; CA 2538023 A1 20050407; EP 1675550 A2 20060705; EP 1675550 A4 20071010; IS 8413 A 20060412; JP 2007517766 A 20070705; KR 20060076319 A 20060704; MX PA06003320 A 20060608; NO 20061284 A 20060622

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-09 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091217

2007-12-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071123

2007-10-10 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20070907

2007-10-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 6/00 20060101AFI20050411BHEP

2007-10-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 45/06 20060101ALI20070903BHEP

2007-01-03 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20060424

- Countries: HR

2007-01-03 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20060424

- Countries: LT

2007-01-03 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20060424

- Countries: LV

2006-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060424

2006-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK