Global Patent Index - EP 1676436 A4

EP 1676436 A4 2009-02-18 - ADVANCED PERSONAL VIDEO RECORDER PROGRAMMING

Title (en)

ADVANCED PERSONAL VIDEO RECORDER PROGRAMMING

Title (de)

ERWEITERTE PROGRAMMIERUNG EINES PERSÖNLICHEN VIDEORECORDERS

Title (fr)

PROGRAMMATION AVANCEE POUR ENREGISTREURS VIDEO PERSONNELS

Publication

EP 1676436 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 04817349 A

Priority

  • US 2004035211 W
  • US 51389603 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2005040987A2] Methods and systems in which Personal Video Recorders, Video On-Demand systems, Internet media visual data providers are employed to deliver visual content to gain specialized programming slots are described. Exemplary embodiments of the present invention provide ways to use these visual content suppliers to produce screen space that can be used for advertisement, still pictures, interactive games, slide shows, telephony functions or other images while the Personal Video Recorder (or like device) is in a state other than "play." The present invention may be used in conjunction with, for example, televisions, computers, cellular phones and other visual media systems.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 5/91 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

G06F (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 5/76 (2013.01); H04N 5/781 (2013.01); H04N 5/783 (2013.01); H04N 9/8042 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2005040987 A2 20050506; WO 2005040987 A3 20050818; EP 1676436 A2 20060705; EP 1676436 A4 20090218

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091125

2009-08-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090714

2009-02-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090116

2007-01-31 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2006-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060418

2006-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR