Global Patent Index - EP 1681403 A3

EP 1681403 A3 2009-02-25 - Equipment for construction of modular equipped walls

Title (en)

Equipment for construction of modular equipped walls

Title (de)

Ausrüstung zur Konstruktion von modular ausgestatteten Wänden

Title (fr)

Equipement pour la construction de murs équipés modulaires

Publication

EP 1681403 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 06425011 A

Priority

IT AN20050005 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1681403A2] The present invention refers to an equipment for the construction of modular equipped walls, characterised in that it makes use of a spacing template basically consisting in a metal section with a large longitudinal stiffening rib and also provided with regularly spaced identical series of through holes used to fix additional modules on the front of the template (such as, for example: cover panels, shelves or object-holding compartments, additional bearing sections) and corresponding spacers on the back of the template used to fix it on the wall, next to identical ones, in order to create a bearing framework for the equipped wall.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 13/0826 (2013.01); E04F 13/08 (2013.01); E04F 13/0807 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1681403 A2 20060719; EP 1681403 A3 20090225; IT AN20050005 A1 20060715

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-27 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090801

2009-12-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU

2006-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU