EP 1689419 A4 20090114 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS INCLUDING LOW DOSAGES OF DESMOPRESSIN
Title (en)
PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS INCLUDING LOW DOSAGES OF DESMOPRESSIN
Title (de)
PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT NIEDRIGEN DOSEN VON DESMOPRESSIN
Title (fr)
COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES COMPORTANT DE LA DESMOPRESSINE FAIBLEMENT DOSEE
Publication
Application
Priority
US 0335662 W 20031110
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2005046707A1] The present invention is directed to a pharmaceutical composition comprising 0.5 ng to 20 µg desmopressin and a pharmaceutically acceptable carrier. The present invention is also directed to a pharmaceutical composition comprising desmopressin and a pharmaceutically acceptable carrier, wherein the pharmaceutical composition is effective to establish a steady plasma/serum desmopressin concentration in the range of from about 0.1 picograms desmopressin per mL plasma/serum to about 10.0 picogram desmopressin per mL plasma/serum. Articles of manufacture and methods of using the above invention are also disclosed.
IPC 8 full level
A61K 9/00 (2006.01); A61K 9/20 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/095 (2019.01); A61K 38/11 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
A61K 9/0019 (2013.01); A61K 9/0056 (2013.01); A61K 9/2018 (2013.01); A61K 38/095 (2018.12); A61P 7/04 (2017.12); A61P 13/00 (2017.12); A61P 13/02 (2017.12); A61P 13/10 (2017.12)
Citation (search report)
- [E] WO 03094886 A2 20031120 - FERRING BV [NL], et al
- [E] WO 2004041153 A2 20040521 - FEIN SEYMOUR H [US]
- [X] AGNOLI G C ET AL: "Low-dose desmopressin infusion: renal action in healthy women in moderate salt retention and depletion, and interactions with prostanoids.", PROSTAGLANDINS LEUKOTRIENES AND ESSENTIAL FATTY ACIDS, vol. 67, no. 4, October 2002 (2002-10-01), pages 263 - 273, XP002505856, ISSN: 0952-3278
- [X] GROSSMAN A ET AL: "TWO NEW MODES OF DESMOPRESSIN (DDAVP) ADMINISTRATION", BRITISH MEDICAL JOURNAL, LONDON, GB, vol. 280, no. 6225, 17 May 1980 (1980-05-17), pages 1215, XP009003428, ISSN: 0267-0623
- [X] JANKNEGT ET AL: "Oral Desmopressin as a New Treatment Modality for Primary Nocturnal Enuresis in Adolescents and Adults: A Double-Blind, Randomized, Multicenter Study", JOURNAL OF UROLOGY, BALTIMORE, MD, US, vol. 157, no. 2, 1 February 1997 (1997-02-01), pages 513 - 517, XP005573964, ISSN: 0022-5347
- See references of WO 2005046707A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2005046707 A1 20050526; AU 2003287591 A1 20040606; AU 2003287591 A8 20050606; AU 2003287591 B2 20090604; AU 2003287591 C1 20091210; CA 2545194 A1 20050526; CA 2545194 C 20141021; CA 2866501 A1 20050526; CN 1878563 A 20061213; EP 1689419 A1 20060816; EP 1689419 A4 20090114; EP 2322194 A2 20110518; EP 2322195 A2 20110518; EP 2322196 A2 20110518; EP 2322197 A2 20110518; EP 2322198 A2 20110518; JP 2007521244 A 20070802; JP 5596252 B2 20140924
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 0335662 W 20031110; AU 2003287591 A 20031110; CA 2545194 A 20031110; CA 2866501 A 20031110; CN 200380110675 A 20031110; EP 03781836 A 20031110; EP 11000464 A 20031110; EP 11000465 A 20031110; EP 11000466 A 20031110; EP 11000467 A 20031110; EP 11000468 A 20031110; JP 2005510644 A 20031110