Global Patent Index - EP 1691025 A3

EP 1691025 A3 2009-02-25 - Window construction and a ventilation device

Title (en)

Window construction and a ventilation device

Title (de)

Rahmen-Baugruppe sowie Luftstrombegrenzungseinrichtung hierfür

Title (fr)

Structure de fenêtre avec un dispositif de ventilation

Publication

EP 1691025 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 05012694 A

Priority

DE 202005002132 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1691025A2] The frame for a door or window has a leaf frame (5) and a blind frame (6) defining a ventilation channel between the inner and outer sides of the frame assembly. There is a sealing lip (17) formed on one frame to obturate the ventilation channel when it is in the closed position. The lip is provided so that airflow through the channel in the open position is below a set level.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 7/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR LV MK YU

EPO simple patent family

DE 202005002132 U1 20060323; EP 1691025 A2 20060816; EP 1691025 A3 20090225; RU 2006103977 A 20070910; RU 2381346 C2 20100210

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-26 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120817

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-10-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090911

2009-07-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090520

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR LV MK YU

2006-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR LV MK YU