Global Patent Index - EP 1694695 A4

EP 1694695 A4 2007-10-31 - COMPLETE MITOCHONDRIAL GENOME SEQUENCES AS A DIAGNOSTIC TOOL FOR THE HEALTH SCIENCES

Title (en)

COMPLETE MITOCHONDRIAL GENOME SEQUENCES AS A DIAGNOSTIC TOOL FOR THE HEALTH SCIENCES

Title (de)

VOLLSTÄNDIGE MITOCHONDRIALE GENOMSEQUENZEN ALS DIAGNOSTISCHES TOOL FÜR DIE MEDIZINISCHEN WISSENSCHAFTEN

Title (fr)

SEQUENCES COMPLETES DU GENOME MITOCHONDRIAL UTILISEES COMME OUTIL DE DIAGNOSTIC POUR DES SCIENCES DE LA SANTE

Publication

EP 1694695 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 04802299 A

Priority

  • CA 2004002124 W
  • US 73237403 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2005056573A1] The examination of mutations in the mitochondrial genome is used as a diagnostic system for diseases such as prostate cancer, and non melanoma skin cancer. Characteristic mutations and rearrangements including, point mutations (transitions, transversions), deletions, inversions, duplications, recombinations, insertions or combinations thereof in the mitochondrial genome are used as early indicators of prostate cancer, and non melanoma skin cancer. Moreover, the 4977 bp, or "common deletion" as well as other associated mutations and/or deletions are used as a measure of aging.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07H 21/04 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G06F 19/18 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/6883 (2013.01); C12Q 1/6886 (2013.01); G06F 19/18 (2013.01); C12Q 2600/112 (2013.01); C12Q 2600/156 (2013.01); C12Q 2600/158 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 03078661 A1 20030925 - GYLLENSTEN ULF [SE], et al
  • [X] DURHAM S E ET AL: "Mitochondrial DNA damage in non-melanoma skin cancer.", BRITISH JOURNAL OF CANCER 13 JAN 2003, vol. 88, no. 1, 13 January 2003 (2003-01-13), pages 90 - 95, XP002450141, ISSN: 0007-0920
  • [A] KOGELNIK ANDREAS M ET AL: "MITOMAP: a human mitochondrial genome database-1998 update", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, vol. 26, no. 1, 1998, pages 112 - 115, XP002966479, ISSN: 0305-1048
  • [T] BANDELT HANS-JÜRGEN ET AL: "What is a 'novel' mtDNA mutation--and does 'novelty' really matter?", JOURNAL OF HUMAN GENETICS 2006, vol. 51, no. 12, 2006, pages 1073 - 1082, XP002450142, ISSN: 1434-5161
  • See also references of WO 2005056573A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2005056573 A1 20050623; CA 2550135 A1 20050623; EP 1694695 A1 20060830; EP 1694695 A4 20071031

INPADOC legal status


2009-03-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080904

2008-08-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GENESIS GENOMICS INC.

2008-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080222

2008-03-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BIRCH-MACHIN, MARK

2008-03-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DAKUBO, GABRIEL D.

2008-03-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: THAYER, ROBERT

2008-03-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PARR, RYAN

2008-03-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NGOM, ALIOUNE

2008-03-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TH'NG, JOHN, THUNDER BAY REGIONAL HEALTH SCIENCES

2007-10-31 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20071001

2007-03-21 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2006-10-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BIRCH-MACHIN, MARK

2006-10-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DAKUBO, GABRIEL D.

2006-10-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: THAYER, ROBERT

2006-10-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PARR, RYAN

2006-10-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NGOM, ALIOUNE

2006-10-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TH'NG, JOHN, THUNDER BAY REGNL. HTH SCS. CENTRE,

2006-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR